EP2064801 - ELECTRIC MOTOR, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE WINDSCREEN WIPER DRIVE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, WITH IMPROVED SEATING FOR THE ARMATURE SHAFT BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUK, Detlef Badstr.20 77871 Renchen / DE | 02 /
HUESGES, Mario Hindenburgstr. 67 77830 Buehlertal / DE | [2009/23] | Application number, filing date | 07787416.2 | 12.07.2007 | [2009/23] | WO2007EP57145 | Priority number, date | DE20061042340 | 08.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006042340 | [2009/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008028711 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2064801 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/16, H02K5/173, H02K7/08, H02K7/116 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
H02K5/1732 (EP,US);
H02K7/116 (KR);
F16C35/077 (EP,US);
H02K5/16 (KR);
H02K5/1672 (EP,US);
H02K5/173 (KR);
H02K7/08 (KR);
H02K7/083 (EP,US);
F16C2326/09 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTOR, INSBESONDERE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGSCHEIBENWISCHER- ANTRIEB, MIT VERBESSERTER AUFNAHME DER ANKERWELLENLAGERUNG | [2009/23] | English: | ELECTRIC MOTOR, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE WINDSCREEN WIPER DRIVE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, WITH IMPROVED SEATING FOR THE ARMATURE SHAFT BEARING | [2009/23] | French: | MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE DESTINÉ NOTAMMENT À UN MÉCANISME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT D'UN ESSUIE-GLACE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE, ET OFFRANT UN LOGEMENT AMÉLIORÉ DU SUPPORT D'ARBRE D'INDUIT | [2009/23] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 15.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/29] | 02.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE3830386 (KRESS ELEKTRIK GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,6,8 * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 14; figures 1-3 * [Y] 1,3-7; | [Y]EP1041303 (MABUCHI MOTOR CO [JP]) [Y] 1,3-7 * column 6, paragraph 22 * * column 9, paragraph 31 - column 10, paragraph 36; figures 10-14 *; | [X]US4369387 (HAAR GERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,10 * column 6, line 42 - line 65; figure 8 *; | [X]DE4032666 (REICH MASCHF GMBH KARL [DE]) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 41 - line 64; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0233805 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,4-6 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 4; figure 1 * |