EP2043425 - DEVICE FOR PROTECTING ANIMALS FROM INSECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hexonia GmbH Van-der-Upwich-Strasse 37 41334 Nettetal / DE | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEXELS, Gerd Reinersstrasse 3 41334 Nettetal / DE | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Markus Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Straße 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Lorenz, Markus Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Straße 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07787504.5 | 13.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007EP57236 | Priority number, date | DE20061034316 | 21.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006034316 | [2009/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008009632 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2043425 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01K13/00, B68C5/00 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
A01K13/008 (EP);
A01K13/006 (EP);
B68C5/00 (EP);
D04B21/12 (EP);
D10B2403/0213 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ VON TIEREN VOR INSEKTEN | [2009/15] | English: | DEVICE FOR PROTECTING ANIMALS FROM INSECTS | [2009/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR PROTÉGER LES ANIMAUX DES INSECTES | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 09.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/28] | 03.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE202006005313U (MAYR ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0034] * [Y] 27; | [X]DE202006005315U (MAYR ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0032] *; | [XDY]DE202005004056U (TEXPLORER GMBH [DE]) [XD] 5-26,28,29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0036] * [Y] 27; | [A]DE202005014483U (GEFA HYGIENE SYSTEME GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] *; | [A]WO9530785 (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE], et al) [A] 1-29 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 183 *; | [E]EP1839484 (MAYR ANDREAS [DE]) [E] 1-29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0023] * | Examination | DE202004011126U | by applicant | DE29609603U | EP1549163 | DE202005004056U | EP0731208 | DE19530928 | DE202005011858U | US5855623 |