EP2062021 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF LOSSES OF LIQUID IN PRESSURE MEASURING SENSORS FILLED WITH PRESSURE-TRANSMITTING LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress+Hauser GmbH+Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANNHAUER, Wolfgang Delitzscher Str. 7 D-06792 Sandersdorf / DE | [2009/26] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
DANNHAUER, Wolfgang Heinersdorfer Weg 38A 14513 Teltow / DE | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 07787556.5 | 16.07.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007EP57288 | Priority number, date | DE20061043499 | 12.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006043499 | [2009/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008031658 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2062021 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2062021 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01L27/00 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
G01M3/32 (EP,US);
G01L19/0046 (EP,US);
G01L19/0672 (EP);
G01L27/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DIAGNOSE VON FLÜSSIGKEITSVERLUSTEN IN MIT DRUCK ÜBERTRAGENDEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN GEFÜLLTEN DRUCKMESSAUFNEHMERN | [2009/22] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF LOSSES OF LIQUID IN PRESSURE MEASURING SENSORS FILLED WITH PRESSURE-TRANSMITTING LIQUIDS | [2009/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DIAGNOSTIC DE PERTES DE LIQUIDE DANS DES CAPTEURS DE MESURE DE PRESSION REMPLIS DE LIQUIDES TRANSMETTEURS DE PRESSION | [2010/14] |
Former [2009/22] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DIAGNOSTIC DE PERTES DE LIQUIDE DANS DES CAPTEURS DE MESURE DE PRESSION REMPLIS DE LIQUIDES TRANSMETTEURS DE PRESSION | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 19.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.10.2010 | CZ | 06.10.2010 | DK | 06.10.2010 | EE | 06.10.2010 | FI | 06.10.2010 | HU | 06.10.2010 | IE | 06.10.2010 | LT | 06.10.2010 | LV | 06.10.2010 | MT | 06.10.2010 | NL | 06.10.2010 | PL | 06.10.2010 | RO | 06.10.2010 | SE | 06.10.2010 | SI | 06.10.2010 | SK | 06.10.2010 | TR | 06.10.2010 | BG | 06.01.2011 | GR | 07.01.2011 | ES | 17.01.2011 | IS | 06.02.2011 | PT | 07.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
TR | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4543832 (VAN OVER WILLIAM E [US]) [A] 2 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 6 ** column 4, line 6 - column 4, line 39 *; | [A]DE3705901 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,3-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3705900 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 6-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10132269 (ENDRESS & HAUSER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005026682 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,3-11 * the whole document *; | [XD]DE102004019222 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [XD] 1,3-11 * the whole document * |