EP2054363 - ASYMMETRIC HYDROGENATION OF 1,1,1-TRIFLUOROACETONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUENTENER, Kurt Gellertstrasse 135 4052 Basel / CH | 02 /
WALDMEIER, Pius Bachstrasse 10 4317 Wegenstetten / CH | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Poppe, Regina F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Poppe, Regina F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2009/19] | Poppe, Regina F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 07787638.1 | 17.07.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007EP57372 | Priority number, date | EP20060117928 | 27.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06117928 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008012240 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2054363 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2054363 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/145, C07C31/38 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
C07C29/145 (EP,KR,US);
C07C31/38 (KR);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/145, C07C31/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ASYMMETRISCHE HYDRIERUNG VON 1,1,1-TRIFLUORACETON | [2009/19] | English: | ASYMMETRIC HYDROGENATION OF 1,1,1-TRIFLUOROACETONE | [2009/19] | French: | HYDROGÉNATION ASYMÉTRIQUE DE 1,1,1-TRIFLUOROACÉTONE | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 23.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | LT | 17.04.2013 | LV | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | MT | 17.04.2013 | RO | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | LU | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | IS | 17.08.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
PT | 19.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [YP]WO2007006650 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [YP] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [YD] - DOUCET ET AL, "Trans-[RuCl2(phosphine)2(1,2-diamine)] and chiral trans- [RuCl2(diphosphine)(1,2-diamine)]: shelf-stable precatalysts for the rapid, productive, and stereoselective hydrogenation of ketones", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE. INTERNATIONAL EDITION, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (1998), vol. 37, no. 12, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 1703 - 1707, XP002222044 [YD] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-3773(19980703)37:12<1703::AID-ANIE1703>3.0.CO;2-I | [YD] - OHKUMA T ET AL, "TRANS-RUH(ETA1-BH4)(BINAP)(1,2-DIAMINE): A CATALYST FOR ASYMMETRIC HYDROGENATION OF SIMPLE KETONES UNDER BASE-FREE CONDITIONS", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20020612), vol. 124, no. 23, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 6508 - 6509, XP001115694 [YD] 1,18-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja026136+ | [YD] - CRAWFORD J W C, "RESOLUTION OF 1-TRIFLUOROMETHYLETHANOL. PART II", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, SECTION C: ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, (1967), vol. C22, ISSN 0022-4952, pages 2332 - 2333, XP009005402 [YD] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/j39670002332 | [Y] - TANG W ET AL, "New Chiral Phosphorosus Ligands for Enantioselective Hydrogenation", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, ACS,WASHINGTON, DC, US, (2003), vol. 103, ISSN 0009-2665, pages 3029 - 3069, XP002284690 [Y] 1-28 * page 3029 * * page 3031, paragraph 2.3.1 - page 3033; figures 2,3 * * page 3058, paragraph 3.2.2 - page 3060; table 20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr020049i | [YD] - M. BUCCIARELLI ET AL., "Asymmetric reduction of trifluoromethyl and methyl ketones by yeast; an improved method.", SYNTHESIS, (1983), pages 897 - 899, XP002455576 [YD] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1983-30555 | by applicant | WO2005014563 |