EP2043754 - LIQUID HEAT EXCHANGER UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mann + Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAINEK, Herbert Eberhard-Gmelin-Str. 4 74074 Heilbronn / DE | [2009/15] | Application number, filing date | 07787751.2 | 20.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007EP57496 | Priority number, date | DE20062011339U | 20.07.2006 Original published format: DE 202006011339 U | [2009/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008009738 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2043754 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2043754 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/18, F01M5/00, F01M11/03 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
B01D35/18 (EP);
F01M11/03 (EP);
F01M2011/033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/36] |
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITS-WÄRMETAUSCHER-EINHEIT | [2009/15] | English: | LIQUID HEAT EXCHANGER UNIT | [2009/15] | French: | GROUPE ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE POUR LIQUIDE | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 21.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.08.2011 | [2012/22] | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19741449 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 4 *; | [X]DE202004011114U (HENGST GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0015] *; | [X]EP1629878 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0012]; figures 3,4 *; | [X]EP0816645 (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 5 * | by applicant | DE19741449 | DE202004011114U | EP0816645 | DE10245005 |