EP2049528 - FUNGICIDAL N-CYCLOALKYL-CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/17] | FUNGICIDE N-CYCLOALKYL-CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES | ||
[2015/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2013/18] |
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience SA 16 rue Jean-Marie Leclair 69009 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNKEL, Ralf 11 rue Pierre Dupont 69001 Lyon / FR | 02 /
GARY, Stéphanie 9 rue Simon buisson 69410 Champagne au mont d'Or / FR | 03 /
GROSJEAN-COURNOYER, Marie-Claire Le Trève Collonge Route d'Albigny 69250 Curis Au Mont D'or / FR | 04 /
RINOLFI, Philippe Résidence le Coteau Lieu dit la Colletière 69380 Chatillon D'azergues / FR | 05 /
TUCH, Arounarith 45 rue de Saint Cyr 69009 Lyon / FR | [2015/42] |
Former [2009/17] | 01 /
DUNKEL, Ralf 11 rue Pierre Dupont 69001 Lyon / FR | ||
02 /
GARY, Stéphanie 9 rue Simon buisson 69410 Champagne au mont d'Or / FR | |||
03 /
GROSJEAN-COURNOYER, Marie-Claire Le Trève Collonge Route d'Albigny 69250 Curis Au Mont D'or / FR | |||
04 /
RINOLFI, Philippe Résidence le Coteau Lieu dit la Colletière 69380 Chatillon D'azergues / FR | |||
05 /
TUCH, Arounarith 45 rue de Saint Cyr 69009 Lyon / FR | Representative(s) | Guitton, Carole, et al Bayer S.A.S. Patents & Licensing Department 14 Impasse Pierre Baizet CS 99163 69263 Lyon Cedex 09 / FR | [2013/18] |
Former [2009/17] | Guitton, Carole Bayer CropScience SA 14-20 rue Pierre Baizet - BP9163 69263 Lyon Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07788037.5 | 30.07.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007EP57836 | Priority number, date | EP20060356098 | 31.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06356098 | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008015189 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2049528 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2049528 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, C07D409/12, C07D413/12, C07D417/12, A01P3/00, A01N43/10, A01N43/36 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/17] | C07D403/12, C07D409/12, C07D413/12, C07D417/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FUNGIZIDE N-CYCLOALKYLCARBOXAMIDDERIVATE | [2015/19] | English: | FUNGICIDAL N-CYCLOALKYL-CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES | [2015/19] | French: | DÉRIVÉS FONGICIDES DE N-CYCLOALKYLCARBOXAMIDE | [2015/19] |
Former [2009/17] | N-CYCLOALKYL-CARBOXAMIDDERIVATE ALS FUNGIZIDE | ||
Former [2009/17] | FUNGICIDE N-CYCLOALKYL-CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES | ||
Former [2009/17] | DÉRIVÉS DE N-CYCLOALKYL-CARBOXAMIDE FONGICIDES | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 05.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2007 | AT | 14.10.2015 | BE | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | CZ | 14.10.2015 | DK | 14.10.2015 | EE | 14.10.2015 | ES | 14.10.2015 | FI | 14.10.2015 | IT | 14.10.2015 | LT | 14.10.2015 | LV | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | NL | 14.10.2015 | PL | 14.10.2015 | RO | 14.10.2015 | SE | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SK | 14.10.2015 | TR | 14.10.2015 | GR | 15.01.2016 | IS | 14.02.2016 | PT | 15.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 30.07.2007 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.07.2007 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.07.2007 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO2007029035 (ANGELETTI P IST RICHERCHE BIO [IT], et al) [PX] 1 * page 31, lines 22,23 * * page 32, line 3 *; | [DX]WO0155124 (BAYER AGROCHEM KK [JP], et al) [DX] 1,3-12 * page 1, Formula (I) * * page 96, lines 4,5 * * page 137, Table 1, Compd. No. 107b * * page 146, Table 4, Compds. Nos. 211, 212 * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20060404), URL: STN, XP002429737 [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20050812), URL: STN, XP002429738 [X] 1 * CAS Registry Number 859872-65-4; column A * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20050811), URL: STN, XP002429739 [X] 1 * CAS Registry Number 859651-09-5; column A * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20050805), URL: STN, XP002429740 [X] 1 * CAS Registry Number 858547-51-0; column A * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20050803), URL: STN, XP002429741 [X] 1 * CAS Registry Number 858113-86-7; column A * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20050711), URL: STN, XP002429742 [X] 1 * CAS Registry Number 854542-46-4; column A * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20050629), URL: STN, XP002429743 [X] 1 * CAS Registry Number 853252-77-4; column A * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20041130), URL: STN, XP002429744 [X] 1 * CAS Registry Number 790718-64-8; column A * |