EP2061779 - ARYL SULFONAMIDES WITH AN ANALGESIC ACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
Former [2009/22] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUFFMANN-HEFNER, Iris Oelbachstrasse 10/1 88448 Attenweiler / DE | 02 /
HAUEL, Norbert Marderweg 12 88433 Schemmerhofen / DE | 03 /
WALTER, Rainer Rudolfsgnadweg 5 88400 Biberach / DE | 04 /
EBEL, Heiner Mondstr. 7 88400 Biberach / DE | 05 /
DOODS, Henri Freiherr-von-Koenig-Str. 6 88447 Warthausen / DE | 06 /
CECI, Angelo Obere Schügelestrasse 20 88441 Mittelbiberach / DE | 07 /
SCHULER-METZ, Annette Holzgasse 7 89081 Ulm / DE | 08 /
KONETZKI, Ingo Muellerweg 9 88447 Warthausen / DE | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2012/40] |
Former [2009/22] | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD-Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 07788420.3 | 14.08.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007EP58408 | Priority number, date | DE20061039003 | 19.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006039003 | [2009/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008022945 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2061779 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2061779 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/02, C07D311/16, C07D205/04, C07D207/06, C07D223/04, C07D403/04, C07D403/06 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
C07D401/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07C311/29 (EP,US);
C07D205/04 (EP,US);
C07D207/06 (EP,US);
C07D223/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D311/16 (KR);
C07D403/04 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Extension states | BA | 19.03.2009 | HR | 19.03.2009 | RS | 19.03.2009 | Title | German: | ARYLSULFONAMIDE MIT ANALGETISCHER WIRKUNG | [2009/22] | English: | ARYL SULFONAMIDES WITH AN ANALGESIC ACTION | [2009/22] | French: | ARYLSULFONAMIDES A EFFET ANALGESIQUE | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10178252.2 / EP2284166 | EP11176839.6 / EP2402329 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.08.2007 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | CZ | 06.11.2013 | DK | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | ES | 06.11.2013 | FI | 06.11.2013 | IT | 06.11.2013 | LT | 06.11.2013 | LV | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | MT | 06.11.2013 | NL | 06.11.2013 | PL | 06.11.2013 | RO | 06.11.2013 | SE | 06.11.2013 | SI | 06.11.2013 | SK | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | GR | 07.02.2014 | IS | 06.03.2014 | PT | 06.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.08.2007 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 06.11.2013 | |
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 06.11.2013 | |
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | ES | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | ES | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 06.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02053516 (FOURNIER LAB SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,8-11 * Formel I;; page 2, lines 1-5; examples 106,116; claims 1,10,11; table 3 *; | [X]WO03106428 (FOURNIER LAB SA [FR], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8-11 * Formel I;; page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 2; examples 49,72; claims 1,10,11 *; | [X]WO2006036664 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11* Formel I;; paragraphs [0004] , [0334] - [0336]; examples 1-3,11,14-16,18,22,24; tables 1,2 *; | [X]WO2006048209 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8-11 * Formel I; Verbindungen 17-24,28,36,38-40;; page 44, line 20 - page 45, line 28; examples 1-4,6,7,13,14,161-166; claims 1,3-5,7-9 *; | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 6007541, XP002466545 [X] 1-3,6 * column A * | [ ] - EL-NAGGAR ET AL., POL. J. CHEM., (1982), vol. 56, no. 10-12, pages 1279 - 1285 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 6009473, XP002466834 [X] 1-3,6 * column A * | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 2905397, XP002466835 [X] 1-3,6 * column A * | [ ] - BRAICHENKO, V. T., PHARM. CHEM. J. (ENGL. TRANSL.), (1972), vol. 6, no. 8, pages 492 - 494 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 2400317, XP002466836 [X] 1-3,6 * column A * | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 9271162, XP002466837 [X] 1-3,6 * column A * | [ ] - MUKHERJEE, G. N., CHAKRABORTY, P. K., J. INDIAN CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 79, no. 2, pages 137 - 141 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 8906721, XP002466838 [X] 1-3,6 * column A * | [ ] - SELVAMURUGAN, V., AIDHEN, INDRAPAL SINGH, SYNTHESIS, (2001), vol. 15, pages 2239 - 2246 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 2709200, XP002466839 [X] 1-3,6 * column A * | [ ] - PAUL, H. ET AL, ARCH. PHARM. BER. DTSCH. PHARM. GES., (1968), vol. 301, pages 512 - 519 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 8789325, XP002466840 [X] 1-3,6 * column A * | [ ] - EL-SHARIEF, A. M. SH., AMMAR, Y. A., ZAHRAN, M. A., ALI, A. H., EL-GABY, M. S. A., MOLECULES, (2001), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 267 - 278 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 2664221, XP002466841 [X] 1-3,6 * column A * | [ ] - SHOEB ET AL., INDIAN J. CHEM., (1965), vol. 3, page 507 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 2674860, XP002466842 [X] 1-3,6 * column A * | [ ] - SEN, YAJNIK, J. INDIAN CHEM. SOC., (1965), vol. 42, pages 145 - 146 | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 2709563, XP002466843 [X] 1-3,6 * column A * | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 2709564, XP002466844 [X] 1-3,6 * column A * | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 2710222, XP002466845 [X] 1-3,6 * column A * | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 2956418, XP002466846 [X] 1-3,6 * column A * | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. BRN 2955989, XP002466847 [X] 1-3,6 * column A * | [X] - MOLANDER G A ET AL, "Reduction of 2-Acylaziridines by Samarium(II) Iodide. An Efficient and Regioselective Route to beta-Amino Carbonyl Compounds", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970630), vol. 53, no. 26, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 8887 - 8912, XP004106098 [X] 1-3,6 * table 3 * | [X] - SARTORI E ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND ACTIVITIES OF NET ARYLSULFONAMIDO THROMBOXANE A2 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUE ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, (1993), vol. 28, no. 7/8, ISSN 0223-5234, pages 625 - 632, XP000396678 [X] 1-3,6 * examples VI-7,VI-8,VI-9; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0223-5234(93)90093-T | by applicant | DE1100635 | WO02053516 | WO03106428 | WO2006036664 | WO2006048209 | - HOUBEN-WEYL, METHODEN DER ORGANISCHEN CHEMIE, vol. 15/2 | - BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2001), vol. 11, pages 2325 - 2330 | - J. MED. CHEM. SIR, (2005), vol. 48, no. 7, pages 2371 - 2387 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 47, pages 4300 - 4315 | - ACTA CHEM. SCAND. SER. B, (1988), vol. 42, pages 373 - 377 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1990), vol. 33, pages 1880 - 1887 | - TETRAHEDRON, (2001), vol. 57, pages 4781 - 4785 | - TETRAHEDRON, (1991), vol. 47, pages 3969 - 3980 | - TETRAHEDRON, (1999), vol. 55, pages 13285 - 13300 | - CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1997), vol. 45, pages 996 - 1007 | - J. MED.CHEM., (2003), vol. 46, pages 4952 - 4964 | - CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1994), vol. 42, pages 74 - 84 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1993), vol. 36, pages 162 - 165 | - PHARM. ACTA HELV., (1969), vol. 44, pages 637 - 643 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1968), vol. 33, pages 3637 - 3639 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1971), vol. 93, pages 4256 - 4263 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1998), vol. 41, pages 5219 - 5246 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1998), vol. 41, pages 4317 - 4328 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1985), vol. 28, pages 1533 - 1536 | - J. CHEM. SOC., (1935), page 871 | - EUR. J. MED.CHEM. CHIM. THER., (2002), vol. 37, pages 487 - 502 | - CHEM. PHARM BULL., (1997), vol. 45, pages 1458 - 1469 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2003), vol. 46, pages 5445 - 5457 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1983), vol. 26, pages 309 - 312 |