EP2062145 - MEMORY ACCESS SECURITY MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 9NJ / GB | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERSHAW, Daniel 79 River Lane Cambridge CB5 8HP / GB | 02 /
BILES, Stuart, David Green Ginger The Green Little Thurlow Suffolk CB9 7JH / GB | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07789144.8 | 08.08.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007GB03010 | Priority number, date | GB20060018042 | 13.09.2006 Original published format: GB 0618042 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008032011 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2062145 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2062145 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/14 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
G06F12/1416 (EP,US);
G06F12/14 (KR);
G06F12/1491 (EP,GB,US);
G06F13/38 (KR);
G06F21/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/07] |
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEICHERZUGANGSSICHERHEITSVERWALTUNG | [2009/22] | English: | MEMORY ACCESS SECURITY MANAGEMENT | [2009/22] | French: | GESTION DE LA SÉCURITÉ D'UN ACCÈS MÉMOIRE | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 15.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004046934 (ADVANCED RISC MACH LTD [GB]) |