EP2054316 - SEAL-TYPE CLOSURE DEVICE WITH PARTIAL OPENING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martin, Claude 71 Route de Mery sur Seine F-10150 Sante Maure / FR | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Claude 71, route de Méry sur Seine F-10150 Sainte Maure / FR | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2010/01] | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2009/19] | Savoye, Jean-Paul, et al Moinas & Savoye S.A., 42, rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 07789632.2 | 08.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007IB02339 | Priority number, date | FR20060007312 | 16.08.2006 Original published format: FR 0607312 | [2009/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008020289 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2054316 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2054316 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/20 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
B65D77/20 (EP);
B65D2577/2008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSVERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG MIT TEILÖFFNUNG | [2009/19] | English: | SEAL-TYPE CLOSURE DEVICE WITH PARTIAL OPENING | [2009/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OBTURATION OPERCULE A OUVERTURE PARTIELLE | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 19.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/not-exclusive | For: | BE BG CY CZ DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Licencee: | MLB SAS 44 Rue Roger Salengro 69740 Genas / FR | Date: | 16.03.2009 | [2009/19] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2010 | CY | 17.03.2010 | CZ | 17.03.2010 | DK | 17.03.2010 | EE | 17.03.2010 | FI | 17.03.2010 | IE | 17.03.2010 | IT | 17.03.2010 | LT | 17.03.2010 | LV | 17.03.2010 | MT | 17.03.2010 | NL | 17.03.2010 | PL | 17.03.2010 | RO | 17.03.2010 | SE | 17.03.2010 | SI | 17.03.2010 | SK | 17.03.2010 | TR | 17.03.2010 | BG | 17.06.2010 | GR | 18.06.2010 | ES | 28.06.2010 | IS | 17.07.2010 | PT | 19.07.2010 | LU | 08.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | HU | 18.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
MT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
LU | 08.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
MT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
MT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3302858 (MILLER RUTH S) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 51; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2159477 (REYNOLDS ALUMINIUMWERKE GMBH) [A] 1-9 * page 3, paragraph 2; figure 2 *; | [A]FR2435406 (BOISE CASCADE CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 5, line 9 - line 29; figure 3 *; | [A]WO0183208 (TEICH AKTIENGESSELLSCHAFT [AT], et al) [A] 1-9* page 5, line 12 - line 27; figures 1-3 * |