EP2070340 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMISSION OF IMAGES FROM A MONITORED AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTEYE Security Ltd. 11 Hamelacha Street 48091 Rosh Ha'ayin / IL | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENTKOVSKI, Yakov 10 Feldman Yosef St. 74058 Ness Ziona / IL | 02 /
BOROVITZ, Moshe 16A Shorer Street 69018 Tel Aviv / IL | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07790018.1 | 01.08.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007IL00963 | Priority number, date | US20060516614 | 07.09.2006 Original published format: US 516614 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008029385 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2070340 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/04, G08B1/08, H04N7/18 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
G08B13/19695 (EP,US);
H04N23/661 (EP,US);
G08B13/19697 (EP,US);
H04N21/2187 (EP,US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
H04N21/42202 (EP,US);
H04N7/181 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/28] | H04W4/00, H04M11/04, G08B1/08 | ||
Former IPC [2009/25] | H04Q7/00, H04M11/04, G08B1/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON BILDERN AUS EINEM ÜBERWACHTEN BEREICH | [2009/25] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMISSION OF IMAGES FROM A MONITORED AREA | [2009/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR UNE TRANSMISSION D'IMAGES DEPUIS UNE ZONE SURVEILLÉE | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 06.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2011 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 27.12.2011 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 18.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 04.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.2011 | 31.08.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004047471 (SAWANO TETSUYA [JP]) [X] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]WO2005116947 (EATON CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 2; figure 1 * * page 23, lines 14-30 *; | [X]WO2006083551 (STYERS JUSTIN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1,3,4 * | International search | [A]US7061399 (LECK MICHAEL JOHN [GB]); | [XE]US2007205888 (LEE SHZE C [US], et al) |