EP2138384 - VEHICLE HOOD STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Shatai Kabushiki Kaisha 100 Kanayama Ichiriyama-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-0002 / JP | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GODA, Naoki c/o TOYOTA SHATAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 100 Kanayama, Ichiriyama-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-0002 / JP | 02 /
UCHINO, Keiichi c/o TOYOTA SHATAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 100 Kanayama, Ichiriyama-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-0002 / JP | [2012/37] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
GODA, Naoki c/o TOYOTA SHATAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 100 Kanayama, Ichiriyama-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-0002 / JP | ||
02 /
UCHINO, Keiichi c/o TOYOTA SHATAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 100 Kanayama, Ichiriyama-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-0002 / JP | |||
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
GODA, Naoki c/o TOYOTA SHATAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 100 KanayamaIchiriyama-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-0002 / JP | ||
02 /
UCHINO, Keiichi c/o TOYOTA SHATAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 100 KanayamaIchiriyama-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-0002 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07790763.2 | 13.07.2007 | [2010/01] | WO2007JP63982 | Priority number, date | JP20070117466 | 26.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007117466 | [2010/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008136136 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2138384 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2138384 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/10, B62D25/12 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
B62D25/105 (EP,US);
B60R13/0838 (EP,US);
F02B29/0475 (EP,US);
F02M35/10019 (EP,US);
F02M35/161 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGHAUBENSTRUKTUR | [2010/01] | English: | VEHICLE HOOD STRUCTURE | [2010/01] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CAPOT DE VEHICULE | [2012/31] |
Former [2010/01] | STRUCTURE DE CAPOT DE VÉHICULE | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2009 | Translation filed | 26.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 07.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.07.2007 | AT | 12.09.2012 | BE | 12.09.2012 | CY | 12.09.2012 | CZ | 12.09.2012 | DK | 12.09.2012 | EE | 12.09.2012 | FI | 12.09.2012 | IT | 12.09.2012 | LT | 12.09.2012 | LV | 12.09.2012 | MC | 12.09.2012 | MT | 12.09.2012 | NL | 12.09.2012 | PL | 12.09.2012 | RO | 12.09.2012 | SE | 12.09.2012 | SI | 12.09.2012 | SK | 12.09.2012 | TR | 12.09.2012 | BG | 12.12.2012 | GR | 13.12.2012 | ES | 23.12.2012 | IS | 12.01.2013 | PT | 14.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
TR | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 12.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006048986 (BRACCIANO DANIEL CHRISTOPHER [US]) [Y] 1,3 * figures 1,2A,2B; claims 1-5 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] *; | [Y]DE4115475 (GERHARDS HEINZ ROLF [DE]) [Y] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH06191292 (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4646864 (RACCHI THEODORE T [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2005186851 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [A]JPH0378685U | by applicant | JP2003226264 |