EP2051028 - REFRIGERANT LOADING METHOD FOR REFRIGERATION DEVICE USING CARBON DIOXIDE AS REFRIGERANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2009/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUOKA, Hiromune c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 02 /
KURIHARA, Toshiyuki c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | [2019/04] |
Former [2009/17] | 01 /
MATSUOKA, Hiromune Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | ||
02 /
KURIHARA, Toshiyuki Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/04] |
Former [2009/17] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07790941.4 | 18.07.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007JP64187 | Priority number, date | JP20060199707 | 21.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006199707 | [2009/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008010519 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2051028 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2051028 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F25B45/00, F25B1/00, F25B9/00, F25B13/00 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
F25B45/00 (EP,KR,US);
F25B1/00 (KR);
F25B9/008 (EP,US);
F25B13/00 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US);
F25B2313/02741 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/17] | F25B45/00, F25B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/04] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÄLTEMITTELFÜLLVERFAHREN FÜR EINE KOHLENDIOXID ALS KÄLTEMITTEL VERWENDENDE KÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [2009/17] | English: | REFRIGERANT LOADING METHOD FOR REFRIGERATION DEVICE USING CARBON DIOXIDE AS REFRIGERANT | [2009/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGEMENT DE RÉFRIGÉRANT DE DISPOSITIF DE RÉFRIGÉRATION AU DIOXYDE DE CARBONE | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2009 | Translation filed | 20.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 11.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2007 | AT | 23.01.2019 | CY | 23.01.2019 | CZ | 23.01.2019 | DK | 23.01.2019 | EE | 23.01.2019 | FI | 23.01.2019 | LT | 23.01.2019 | LV | 23.01.2019 | MC | 23.01.2019 | MT | 23.01.2019 | NL | 23.01.2019 | PL | 23.01.2019 | RO | 23.01.2019 | SE | 23.01.2019 | SI | 23.01.2019 | SK | 23.01.2019 | BG | 23.04.2019 | GR | 24.04.2019 | IS | 23.05.2019 | PT | 23.05.2019 | IE | 18.07.2019 | LU | 18.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 18.07.2007 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
IE | 18.07.2019 | ||
LU | 18.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
IE | 18.07.2019 | ||
LU | 18.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
IE | 18.07.2019 | ||
LU | 18.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
LU | 18.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 23.01.2019 | |
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 23.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006101835 (MELDAHL KENNETH [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * page 2 - page 3; figure 1 *; | [Y]JPH11132602 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-3 * page 2 - page 5; figures 1-7 * | International search | [Y]JPS5487908 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH11132602 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JP2001074342 (SANDEN CORP) | Examination | US2005132729 | by applicant | JP2001074342 |