EP2045975 - COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | Change - extension states | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANABE, Akimichi C/O Intellectual Property Department NTTDoCoMo,Inc, SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
KOZU, Kazuyuki C/O Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo,Inc, SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 -6150 / JP | 03 /
YABUSAKI, Masami C/O intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo,Inc, SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07791110.5 | 20.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007JP64373 | Priority number, date | JP20060198487 | 20.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006198487 | [2009/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008010580 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2045975 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04M3/00, H04L29/06 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
H04M3/42042 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04L12/22 (KR);
H04L45/22 (EP,US);
H04L45/304 (EP,US);
H04L45/306 (EP,US);
H04M7/123 (EP,US);
H04W36/00226 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/1446 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/15] | H04L12/56, H04M3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERVORRICHTUNG | [2009/15] | English: | COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL APPARATUS | [2009/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE TRANSMISSION | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2009 | Translation filed | 12.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 16.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/31] | 14.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006002355 (BAEK HYE-WON [KR], et al); | International search | [X]JP2005312084 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JP2006191514 (NEC CORP); |