Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8327209 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2012 | B2 | US2010005362 | 07.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007JP64421 | 23.07.2007 | JP2006204781 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4678440B | Global Dossier | 27.04.2011 | B2 | JPWO2008013135 | 17.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007JP64421 | 23.07.2007 | JP2006204781 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2051243 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2010 | A4 | EP2051243 | 22.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007JP64421 | 23.07.2007 | JP2006204781 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0713809 | 06.11.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007JP64421 | 23.07.2007 | JP2006204781 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2658962 | 31.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007JP64421 | 23.07.2007 | JP2006204781 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101490749B | 11.04.2012 | B | CN101490749 | 22.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007JP64421 | 23.07.2007 | JP2006204781 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009000054 | 23.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007JP64421 | 23.07.2007 | JP2006204781 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008013135 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006204781 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101032805B | Global Dossier | 04.05.2011 | B1 | KR20090025355 | 10.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006204781 | 27.07.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2009102043 | 27.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006204781 | 27.07.2006 |