EP2051243 - AUDIO DATA DECODING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Hironori c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
OZAWA, Kazunori c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 (Fünf Höfe) 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07791154.3 | 23.07.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007JP64421 | Priority number, date | JP20060204781 | 27.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006204781 | [2009/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008013135 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2051243 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
G10L19/005 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/06 (KR);
G10L19/12 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/17] | G10L19/00, G10L19/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/35] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUDIODATEN-DEKODIERUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2009/17] | English: | AUDIO DATA DECODING DEVICE | [2009/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE DE DONNÉES AUDIO | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2009 | Translation filed | 27.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 28.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/30] | 11.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - EMRE GÜNDÜZHANGUNDUZHAN ET AL, "A Linear Prediction Based Packet Loss Concealment Algorithm for PCM Coded Speech", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SPEECH AND AUDIO PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20011101), vol. 9, no. 8, ISSN 1063-6676, XP011054140 [X] 1,6 * abstract * * page 780, column l, line 1 - page 781, column l, line 23 * | International search | [A]JPH0223744 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH088933 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH09231783 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2001177481 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A] - SERIZAWA M. ET AL., "Chien Packet o Mochiita Filter Memory Shufuku ni yoru CELP Fukugo Onshitsu Kaizen Hoho", SOCIETY TAIKAI KOEN RONBUNSHU, (20010829), vol. D-14-4, page 234, XP003020731 | [A] - MORINAGA T. ET AL., "Kotaiiki IP Mo ni Okeru Packet Shoshitsu ni Taisei no Aru Onsei Fugoka", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2001 IEICE GENERAL CONFERENCE TSUSHIN 2, (20010307), vol. B-8-12, page 377, XP003020732 | by applicant | JPH11305797 | JP2002268697 | JP2005274917 |