EP2052726 - FERTILITY AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JCR PHARMACEUTICALS Co., LTD. 3-19, Kasuga-cho Ashiya Hyogo 659-0021 / JP | [2009/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIOTANI, Masahide 11-77, Sumiyoshiyamate 4-chome Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 658-0063 / JP | 02 /
GOTO, Sakae 28-11, Okutenjincho 1-chome Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1118 / JP | [2015/29] |
Former [2009/18] | 01 /
SHIOTANI, Masahide 11-77, Sumiyoshiyamate 4-chome Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 658-0063 / JP | ||
02 /
GOTO, Sakae 28-11, Okutenjincho 1-chome Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1118 / JP | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Isarpatent Patentanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/18] | Behnisch, Werner Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07791646.8 | 31.07.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007JP64961 | Priority number, date | JP20060212797 | 04.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006212797 | [2009/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008016039 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052726 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2052726 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/48, A61P15/08 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
A61K35/48 (EP,US);
A61P15/08 (EP);
C12N2502/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FERTILITÄTSMITTEL | [2009/18] | English: | FERTILITY AGENT | [2009/18] | French: | AGENT DE FÉCONDITÉ | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2009 | Translation filed | 23.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 07.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2007 | AT | 15.07.2015 | BE | 15.07.2015 | BG | 15.07.2015 | CY | 15.07.2015 | CZ | 15.07.2015 | DK | 15.07.2015 | EE | 15.07.2015 | ES | 15.07.2015 | FI | 15.07.2015 | IS | 15.07.2015 | IT | 15.07.2015 | LT | 15.07.2015 | LV | 15.07.2015 | MC | 15.07.2015 | MT | 15.07.2015 | NL | 15.07.2015 | PL | 15.07.2015 | RO | 15.07.2015 | SE | 15.07.2015 | SI | 15.07.2015 | SK | 15.07.2015 | TR | 15.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | IE | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | LU | 31.07.2015 | GR | 16.10.2015 | PT | 16.11.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 31.07.2007 | |
AT | 15.07.2015 | ||
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
BG | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
IE | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
IE | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
IE | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
IE | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
IE | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 15.07.2015 | |
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 15.07.2015 | |
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 15.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005241013 (SHER GEOFFREY [US])[A] 1-16; | [X] - KAPITEIJN K ET AL, "Human embryo-conditioned medium stimulates in vitro endometrial angiogenesis", FERTILITY AND STERILITY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC, NEW YORK, NY, USA, vol. 85, doi:10.1016/J.FERTNSTERT.2005.11.029, ISSN 0015-0282, (20060401), pages 1232 - 1239, (20060401), XP025234987 [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fertnstert.2005.11.029 | [T] - ZHU W ET AL, "Injection of day 2 embryo culture supernatant into the uterine cavity did not improve the pregnancy rate of day 3 embryo transfer in patients who underwent in vitro fertilization-embryo transfer: a randomized clinical trial", FERTILITY AND STERILITY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC, NEW YORK, NY, USA, vol. 93, no. 7, ISSN 0015-0282, (20100501), pages 2216 - 2221, (20090512), XP027021073 [T] 1,2,6,7,11,12 * the whole document * | [T] - GOTO S ET AL, "Stimulation of endometrium embryo transfer can improve implantation and pregnancy rates for patients undergoing assisted reproductive technology for the first time with a high-grade blastocyst", FERTILITY AND STERILITY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC, NEW YORK, NY, USA, vol. 92, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.FERTNSTERT.2008.08.076, ISSN 0015-0282, (20091001), pages 1264 - 1268, (20081017), XP026670232 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fertnstert.2008.08.076 | [A] - KRÜSSEL JAN-S ET AL, "Regulation of embryonic implantation", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF OBSTETRICS, GYNECOLOGY, AND REPRODUCTIVE BIOLOGY 22 SEP 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:12965085,, (20030922), vol. 110 Suppl 1, pages S2 - S9, XP002581978 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0301-2115(03)00167-2 | [A] - SMITH A L, "Blastocyst culture in human IVF: The final destination or a stop along the way?", THERIOGENOLOGY, & PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE INTERNATIONAL EMBRYO TRANSFER SOCIETY; FOZ DO IGUASSU, PARANA, BRAZIL; JANUARY 12-15, 2001, (20020102), vol. 57, no. 1, ISSN 0093-691X, pages 97 - 107, XP002671850 [A] 1-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0093-691X(01)00660-4 | International search | [A]US2005241013 (SHER GEOFFREY [US]); | [AP]WO2007012117 (ADELAIDE RES & INNOVATION PTY [AU], et al); | [XP] - GOTO S., "Nidankai Hai Ishoku no Genkyo to Kongo no Tenbo", JOURNAL OF JAPAN SOCIETY FOR REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE, (20061001), vol. 51, no. 4, page 213, XP003020631 | [XP] - GOTO S., "Haibanho Ishoku ni Sakidatsu Hai Baiyoeki Josei Shikyu Chitsunai Chunyu ni yoru Chakushoritsu Oyobi Ninshinritsu no Kaizen -Hai ni yoru Hai Juyono Koshin no Gainen ni Motozuku Atarashii Hai Ishoku Hoho: Shikyu Naimaku Shigeki Hai Ishokuho-", JOURNAL OF JAPAN SOCIETY FOR REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE, (20061001), vol. 51, no. 4, page 276, XP003020632 | [A] - GOTO S. ET AL., "Chakusho Fuzen no Kaizen o Mezashite 4. Chiryoho 5) Nidankai Hai Ishokuho", OBSTETRICS & GYNECOLOGY, (20031001), vol. 70, no. 10, pages 1362 - 1367, XP003020633 | [A] - WATSON E.D., "SUPPRESSION OF LYMPHOCYTE REACTIVITY BY CULTURE SUPERNATANT FROM HORSE EMBRYOS AND ENDOMETRIUM", BIOL. REPROD., (1990), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 294 - 300, XP003020634 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1095/biolreprod42.2.294 | [A] - LIU H.C. ET AL., "PRODUCTION OF INSULIN-LIKE GROWTH FACTOR BINDING PROTEINS (IGFBPS) BY HUMAN ENDOMETRIAL STROMAL CELLS IS STIMULATED BY THE PRESENCE OF EMBRYOS", J. ASSIST. REPROD. GENET., (1995), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 78 - 87, XP003020635 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02211374 | by applicant | - DE LOS SANTOS MJ ET AL., BIOL REPROD., (1998), vol. 59, pages 1419 - 1424 | - JURISICOVA A ET AL., HUM REPROD., (1999), vol. 14, pages 1852 - 1858 | - TAZUKE SI; GIUDICE LC, SEMIN REPROD ENDOCRINOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 231 - 245 | - SIMON C ET AL., J CLIN ENDOCRINOL METAB., (1997), vol. 82, pages 2607 - 2616 | - GIUDICE LC, SEMIN REPROD ENDOCRINOL., (1995), vol. 13, pages 93 - 101 | - SHETH KV ET AL., FERTIL STERIL., (1991), vol. 55, pages 952 - 957 | - BARANAO RI ET AL., AM J REPROD IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 37, pages 191 - 194 | - LICHT P; RUSSU V; WILDT L, SEMIN REPROD MED., (2001), vol. 19, pages 37 - 47 | - PERRIER D'HAUTERIVE S ET AL., HUM REPROD., (2004), vol. 19, pages 2633 - 2643 | - WAKUDA K ET AL., J REPROD FERTIL., (1999), vol. 115, pages 315 - 324 | - GARDNER DK ET AL., HUM REPROD., (1998), vol. 13, pages 3434 - 3440 | - SCHOLTES MC; ZEILMAKER GH, FERTIL STERIL., (1998), vol. 69, pages 78 - 83 | - MILKI AA; FISCH JD; BEHR B, FERTIL STERIL., (1999), vol. 72, pages 225 - 228 | - GARDNER DK ET AL., FERTIL STERIL, (1998), vol. 69, pages 84 - 88 | - EDWARDS RG; BEARD HK, HUM REPROD., (1999), vol. 14, pages 1 - 4 |