EP2050613 - SEAT SLIDE DEVICE FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2012/47] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOJIMA, Yasuhiro c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 02 /
HAYAKAWA, Masatoshi c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2012/47] |
Former [2009/17] | 01 /
KOJIMA, Yasuhiro c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | ||
02 /
HAYAKAWA, Masatoshi c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/47] |
Former [2009/17] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07792076.7 | 07.08.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007JP65407 | Priority number, date | JP20060214838 | 07.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006214838 | [2009/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008018435 | Date: | 14.02.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2050613 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2050613 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/08 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
B60N2/0881 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/17] | B60N2/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/38] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SITZGLEITVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUG | [2009/17] | English: | SEAT SLIDE DEVICE FOR VEHICLE | [2009/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF COULISSANT DE SIEGE POUR VEHICULE | [2012/27] |
Former [2009/17] | DISPOSITIF COULISSANT DE SIÈGE POUR VÉHICULE | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2009 | Translation filed | 14.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 10.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2831228 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1-9,12 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - line 10 * * page 2, line 23 - line 36 * * page 3, line 15 - page 5, line 32; figures 1-3 * [A] 10-11 | International search | [Y]JP2006027329 (SHIROKI CORP); | [Y]JP2000038063 (DELTA KOGYO CO) | by applicant | JP2006027329 |