EP2055514 - AIR CONDITIONER FOR AUTOMOBILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 2-1917, Nisshin-cho Kita-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 331-8501 / JP | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONDA, Masaharu c/o CALSONIC KANSEI CORPORATION 2-1917, Nisshin-cho, Kita-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 331-8501 / JP | 02 /
TSUKUDA, Ryuji c/o CALSONIC KANSEI CORPORATION 2-1917, Nisshin-cho, Kita-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 331-8501 / JP | 03 /
YANASHIMA, Hiromichi c/o CALSONIC KANSEI CORPORATION 2-1917, Nisshin-cho, Kita-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 331-8501 / JP | [2014/08] |
Former [2009/19] | 01 /
ONDA, Masaharu c/o CALSONIC KANSEI CORPORATION 2-1917, Nisshin-cho, Kita-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 331-8501 / JP | ||
02 /
TSUKUDA, Ryuji c/o CALSONIC KANSEI CORPORATION 2-1917, Nisshin-cho, Kita-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 331-8501 / JP | |||
03 /
YANASHIMA, Hiromichi c/o CALSONIC KANSEI CORPORATION 2-1917, Nisshin-cho, Kita-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 331-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2009/19] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07792647.5 | 17.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007JP66031 | Priority number, date | JP20060225291 | 22.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006225291 | JP20070170352 | 28.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007170352 | [2009/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008023641 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055514 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2055514 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
B60H1/00685 (EP,KR,US);
B60H1/0005 (EP,KR,US);
B60H1/00521 (KR);
B60H1/00849 (KR);
B60H2001/00714 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/38] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2014/08] | English: | AIR CONDITIONER FOR AUTOMOBILE | [2009/19] | French: | CLIMATISATION POUR VEHICULE | [2009/19] |
Former [2009/19] | KLIMAANLAGE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2009 | Translation filed | 20.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 24.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.01.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004152410 (SEKI HIDEKI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0033] - [0044] - [0080] , [0083]; figures 1-6,8,9,10 * [I] 4,5; | [X]DE19916992 (VALEO CLIMATISATION [FR]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 41; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2004112075 (KACHI MICHIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0029]; figures 1-3 *; | [XPI]US2007181295 (MASATSUGU AKIRA [JP]) [XP] 1-3 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0087]; figures 1-5 * [I] 4,5; | [A]US2001012756 (KOMOWSKI MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 4,5 * paragraphs [0034] - [0038]; figures 1,2,7,8 * | International search | [XP]JP2007099188 (DENSO CORP); | [X]JP2005271772 (JAPAN CLIMATE SYSTEMS CORP) | by applicant | JP2001113931 |