EP2055757 - CIRCUIT CONNECTING MATERIAL, CONNECTION STRUCTURE OF CIRCUIT MEMBER, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CONNECTION STRUCTURE OF CIRCUIT MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Company, Ltd. 1-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0449 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Company, Ltd. 1-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0449 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARIFUKU, Motohiro c/o Hitachi Chemical Company, Ltd. 1150, Goshomiya Chikusei-shi, Ibaraki 308-8524 / JP | 02 /
MOCHIZUKI, Nichiomi c/o Hitachi Chemical Company, Ltd. 1150, Goshomiya Chikusei-shi, Ibaraki 308-8524 / JP | 03 /
KOBAYASHI, Kouji c/o Hitachi Chemical Company, Ltd. 1150, Goshomiya Chikusei-shi, Ibaraki 308-8524 / JP | 04 /
NAKAZAWA, Takashi c/o Hitachi Chemical Company, Ltd. 1150, Goshomiya Chikusei-shi, Ibaraki 308-8524 / JP | 05 /
TATSUZAWA, Takashi c/o Hitachi Chemical Company, Ltd. 1150, Goshomiya Chikusei-shi, Ibaraki 308-8524 / JP | 06 /
MASUDA, Katsuyuki c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 1500, Ogawa Chikusei-shi, Ibaraki 308-8521 / JP | 07 /
EJIRI, Takako HITACHI CHEMICAL COMPANY, LTD. 1500, Ogawa Chikusei-shi, Ibaraki 308-8521 / JP | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/19] | Jönsson, Hans-Peter Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 07792745.7 | 20.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007JP66132 | Priority number, date | JP20060225290 | 22.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006225290 | JP20070139439 | 25.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007139439 | [2009/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008023670 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055757 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/32, C09J9/02, C09J11/08, H01B1/22, H01B1/24, H01B3/00, H01R4/04, C09J163/00, C09J179/08, C08G73/10 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
H05K3/323 (EP,US);
C09J127/12 (KR);
C08G73/1039 (EP,US);
C09J11/08 (EP,US);
C09J163/00 (EP,US);
C09J179/08 (EP,US);
C09J9/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01B1/22 (EP,KR,US);
H01B1/24 (EP,US);
H01B3/004 (EP,US);
H01R4/04 (EP,US);
H05K3/36 (KR);
C08K9/02 (EP,US);
C08L2666/28 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2929 (EP,US);
H01L2224/293 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83851 (EP,US);
H01L2924/07811 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12044 (EP,US);
H05K2201/015 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09J163/00, C08L2666/28 (EP,US);
H01L2924/07811, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/10253, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12044, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2009/19] | C09J9/02, C09J5/06, C09J11/08, C09J179/08, H01R11/01, H05K3/36, H01B1/00, H01B1/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Extension states | AL | 26.02.2009 | BA | 26.02.2009 | HR | 26.02.2009 | MK | 26.02.2009 | RS | 26.02.2009 | Title | German: | SCHALTKREISVERBINDUNGSMATERIAL, VERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR EINES SCHALTKREISGLIEDES UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER VERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR EINES SCHALTKREISGLIEDES | [2009/19] | English: | CIRCUIT CONNECTING MATERIAL, CONNECTION STRUCTURE OF CIRCUIT MEMBER, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CONNECTION STRUCTURE OF CIRCUIT MEMBER | [2009/19] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE CONNEXION DE CIRCUITS, STRUCTURE DE CONNEXION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE CIRCUIT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE LADITE STRUCTURE | [2011/40] |
Former [2009/19] | MATÉRIAU DE CONNEXION DE CIRCUITS, STRUCTURE DE CONNEXION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE CIRCUIT ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE LADITE STRUCTURE | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2009 | Translation filed | 26.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/38] | 02.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/38] | Divisional application(s) | EP10175398.6 / EP2257141 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0475655 (SOKEN KAGAKU KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,12-17 * page 8, line 36 - page 11, line 55; figures 1-4 * * abstract *; | [XA]US4824511 (HARTMAN FREDERICK N [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * column 2, lines 16-63; claim 1 * * abstract * [A] 13-17; | [X]EP1076082 (SONY CHEMICALS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7,12-17 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012]; figures 1a,1b *; | [Y]EP0549159 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-4,11-14,17 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 32; figures 1,2 * * abstract *; | [Y]JPH10102025 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-4,11-14,17 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH05279649 ; | [Y]JPH10102025 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2002371260 (SHINETSU POLYMER CO); | [Y]JP2004051970 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [Y]JP2000044905 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO); | [Y]JP2001049228 (SONY CHEMICALS); | [Y]JP2005166934 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2005089678 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2005120269 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2006002035 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [XP]JP2006299025 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | WO9844067 | WO0115505 |