EP2078546 - GAME DEVICE, NOTIFICATION METHOD, INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 7-2, Akasaka 9-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | [2009/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASAMI, Yuichi c/o Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 7-2, Akasaka 9-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07792882.8 | 22.08.2007 | [2009/29] | WO2007JP66296 | Priority number, date | JP20060228691 | 25.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006228691 | [2009/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008023740 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2078546 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2078546 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/06, A63F13/00, A63F13/10 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
A63F13/214 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/537 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/218 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/44 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/814 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/211 (EP,KR);
A63F13/235 (EP,KR);
A63F13/24 (EP,KR);
A63F13/28 (EP,KR);
A63F13/335 (EP,KR);
A63F13/493 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/1031 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/1043 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/105 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/1056 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/1068 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/302 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/303 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/407 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/636 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/638 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/8047 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/47] |
Former [2009/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIELVORRICHTUNG, BENACHRICHTIGUNGSVERFAHREN, INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND PROGRAMM | [2009/29] | English: | GAME DEVICE, NOTIFICATION METHOD, INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM, AND PROGRAM | [2009/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE JEU, PROCÉDÉ DE NOTIFICATION, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | [2009/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2009 | Translation filed | 24.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 03.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 20.05.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 20.05.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5837952 (OSHIRO KAZUHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figure 1 ** column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 3 *; | [A]KR20010093735 (KONAMI CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [A]JP2003024621 (TAITO CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 3,4 * | International search | [Y]WO9732641 (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH11253656 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [Y]JP2000207990 (KONAMI CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003093741 (NAMCO LTD); | [Y]JP2005021563 (NAMCO LTD) | by applicant | JP2000293294 | JP2006228691 |