Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2056617
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
31.08.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |
14.05.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.09.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.04.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] |
03.04.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
03.04.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
17.03.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.02.2009 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
25.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.02.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|