Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9031000 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2015 | B2 | US2013010961 | 10.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213614507 | 13.09.2012 | US43848009 | 23.02.2009 | JP2006228348 | 24.08.2006 | JP2007009331 | 18.01.2007 | JP2006294475 | 30.10.2006 | WO2007JP66416 | 24.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8289924 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2012 | B2 | US2010232503 | 16.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006228348 | 24.08.2006 | JP2007009331 | 18.01.2007 | JP2006294475 | 30.10.2006 | WO2007JP66416 | 24.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5094724B | Global Dossier | 12.12.2012 | B2 | JPWO2008023781 | 14.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006228348 | 24.08.2006 | JP2007009331 | 18.01.2007 | JP2008530960 | 24.08.2007 | JP2006294475 | 30.10.2006 | WO2007JP66416 | 24.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5303664B | Global Dossier | 02.10.2013 | B2 | JP2012110035 | 07.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012025955 | 09.02.2012 | JP2006228348 | 24.08.2006 | JP2007009331 | 18.01.2007 | JP2006294475 | 30.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2056617 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006228348 | 24.08.2006 | JP2007009331 | 18.01.2007 | JP2006294475 | 30.10.2006 | WO2007JP66416 | 24.08.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008023781 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006228348 | 24.08.2006 | JP2007009331 | 18.01.2007 | JP2006294475 | 30.10.2006 |