EP2054502 - NOVEL ENGINEERED MICROORGANISM PRODUCING HOMO-SUCCINIC ACID AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SUCCINIC ACID USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology 373-1, Gusung-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-701 / KR | [2017/26] |
Former [2014/14] | For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology 373-1, Gusung-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-701 / KR | ||
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology 373-1 Gusung-Dong Yuseong-Gu, Daejeon 305-701 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sang Yup 212-702, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | 02 /
LIM, Sung Won 9-308, Gaepo 4cha Woosung Apt. Dogok-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-270 / KR | 03 /
SONG, Hyohak 112-1105, Hanaro Apt. Wolpyeong 3-dong, Seo-gu Daejeon 302-283 / KR | [2014/14] |
Former [2009/19] | 01 /
LEE, Sang Yup 212-702, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | ||
02 /
LIM, Sung Won 9-308, Gaepo 4cha Woosung Apt. Dogok-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-270 / KR | |||
03 /
SONG, Hyohak 112-1105, Hanaro Apt. Wolpyeong 3-dong, Seo-gu Daejeon 302-283 / KR | Representative(s) | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2017/26] |
Former [2014/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/19] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07793240.8 | 25.07.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007KR03574 | Priority number, date | KR20060071666 | 28.07.2006 Original published format: KR 20060071666 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008013405 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2054502 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2054502 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2054502 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/21 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
C12P7/46 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (KR,US);
C12N15/902 (US);
C12N9/0006 (EP,US);
C12N9/1029 (EP,US);
C12N9/1217 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/26] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NEUKONSTRUIERTER, HOMO-BERNSTEINSÄURE PRODUZIERENDER MIKROORGANISMUS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BERNSTEINSÄURE DAMIT | [2009/19] | English: | NOVEL ENGINEERED MICROORGANISM PRODUCING HOMO-SUCCINIC ACID AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SUCCINIC ACID USING THE SAME | [2009/19] | French: | MICROORGANISME PRODUIT PAR GÉNIE GÉNÉTIQUE PRODUISANT DE L'ACIDE HOMO-SUCCINIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'ACIDE SUCCINIQUE AU MOYEN DUDIT MICRO-ORGANISME | [2009/19] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 03.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.01.2015
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Immermannstrasse 40 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.01.2015
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Immermannstrasse 40 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | 11.02.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.09.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.09.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.10.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 31.10.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.05.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2007 | AT | 02.04.2014 | CY | 02.04.2014 | CZ | 02.04.2014 | EE | 02.04.2014 | LT | 02.04.2014 | LV | 02.04.2014 | MC | 02.04.2014 | MT | 02.04.2014 | PL | 02.04.2014 | RO | 02.04.2014 | SI | 02.04.2014 | SK | 02.04.2014 | TR | 02.04.2014 | BG | 02.07.2014 | GR | 03.07.2014 | IE | 25.07.2014 | LU | 25.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | IS | 02.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 25.07.2007 | |
AT | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IE | 25.07.2014 | ||
LU | 25.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IE | 25.07.2014 | ||
LU | 25.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IE | 25.07.2014 | ||
LU | 25.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IE | 25.07.2014 | ||
LU | 25.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
LU | 25.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
LU | 25.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
LU | 25.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 02.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0200846 (BIOINFORMATIX INC [KR], et al); | [PX]WO2007030830 (GENOMATICA INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-4,6-8,11-13 * the whole document, in particular p.3, l.3-29; p.23, l.12-25; p.27, l.15-27 and claims 8,14,27 *; | [T]WO2009008574 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR], et al); | [AD] - SONG H ET AL, "Production of succinic acid by bacterial fermentation", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, STONEHAM, MA, US, vol. 39, no. 3, ISSN 0141-0229, (20060703), pages 352 - 361, (20060703), XP025095191 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.enzmictec.2005.11.043 | International search | [A]WO2005052135 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR], et al); | [A]US2006046288 (SAN KA-YIU [US], et al); | [A]US2006141594 (SAN KA-YIU [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2005052135 |