EP2047449 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING AND USING PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION INFORMATION CONTAINING BUS STOP-CONNECTED INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Jun Hyung LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 19-1 Cheongho-ri Jinwi-myeon Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 451-713 / KR | [2013/47] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
PARK, Jun Hyung LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 19-1 Cheongho-ri Jinwi-myeon Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 451-713 / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/16] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07793334.9 | 31.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007KR03679 | Priority number, date | KR20060073626 | 04.08.2006 Original published format: KR 20060073626 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008016252 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047449 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2047449 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/123, G08G1/09 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
G08G1/123 (EP,KR,US);
G08G1/092 (EP,US);
G08G1/13 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/16] | G08G1/123 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEREITSTELLEN UND VERWENDEN VON INFORMATIONEN ÜBER ÖFFENTLICHEN TRANSPORT, DIE MIT HALTESTELLEN VERBUNDENE INFORMATIONEN ENTHALTEN | [2009/16] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING AND USING PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION INFORMATION CONTAINING BUS STOP-CONNECTED INFORMATION | [2009/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE FOURNITURE ET D'UTILISATION DE DONNÉES DE TRANSPORT PUBLIC CONTENANT DES INFORMATIONS LIÉES AUX ARRÊTS DE BUS | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 29.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2007 | AT | 20.11.2013 | BE | 20.11.2013 | BG | 20.11.2013 | CY | 20.11.2013 | CZ | 20.11.2013 | DK | 20.11.2013 | EE | 20.11.2013 | ES | 20.11.2013 | FI | 20.11.2013 | IT | 20.11.2013 | LT | 20.11.2013 | LV | 20.11.2013 | MC | 20.11.2013 | MT | 20.11.2013 | NL | 20.11.2013 | PL | 20.11.2013 | RO | 20.11.2013 | SE | 20.11.2013 | SI | 20.11.2013 | SK | 20.11.2013 | TR | 20.11.2013 | GR | 21.02.2014 | IS | 20.03.2014 | PT | 20.03.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | GB | 31.07.2014 | IE | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | LU | 31.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 31.07.2007 | |
AT | 20.11.2013 | ||
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 31.07.2014 | ||
IE | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
LU | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 31.07.2014 | ||
IE | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
LU | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 31.07.2014 | ||
IE | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
LU | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 31.07.2014 | ||
IE | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
LU | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 31.07.2014 | ||
IE | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
LU | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 31.07.2014 | ||
IE | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
LU | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
LU | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
LU | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
LU | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 20.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002069017 (SCHMIER KENNETH J [US], et al) [X] 2,6,8,9,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0076]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0088]; figure 6 * [I] 1,3,5,7,10,12-15; | [XI]GB2382709 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,11-14 * abstract * * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 2 * * page 18, line 27 - page 20, line 20; figure 1 * * page 21, line 9 - page 22, line 13; figure 2 * [I] 3,4,7,10,15; | [XI]US5736940 (BURGENER E C [CA]) [X] 1,2,6,8,9,11-14 * abstract * * column 4, line 32 - column 6, line 39; figures 1-3 * * column 9, line 13 - column 10, line 62; figure 4 * [I] 3-5,7,10,15; | [I]US2006074545 (KIM JAE-HO [KR]) [I] 1,2,4-6,8,9,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]KR20060002468 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20050078013 (EB CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]KR20060063717 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP]); | [A]JP2004288030 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2004015743 (VEHICLE INFORMATION & COMM SYS) |