EP2057709 - SECONDARY BATTERY INCLUDING ONE-WAY EXHAUST VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu, Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2012/10] |
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong Youndungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Seung-Jin 303, 64, Mannyeon-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-834 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Jeong Hee 102-103, Daewoo Apt. 1170-2, Daeyeon 4-dong Nam-gu Busan 608-794 / KR | 03 /
LEE, HanHo 103-204, Hyundai Apt. 431-6, Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | 04 /
RYU, Ji Heon 460-15, Beon 1-dong Gangbuk-gu Seoul 142-865 / KR | [2012/10] |
Former [2009/20] | 01 /
YANG, Seung-Jin 303, 64, Mannyeon-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-834 / KR | ||
02 /
CHOI, Jeong Hee 102-103, Daewoo Apt. 1170-2, Daeyeon 4-dong Nam-gu Busan 608-794 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, HanHo 103-204, Hyundai Apt. 431-6, Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | |||
04 /
RYU, Ji Heon 460-15, Beon 1-dong Gangbuk-gu Seoul 142-865 / KR | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/20] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07793691.2 | 25.08.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007KR04095 | Priority number, date | KR20060081422 | 28.08.2006 Original published format: KR 20060081422 | [2009/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008026854 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2057709 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2057709 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/02, H01M2/02, H01M2/08, H01M10/04, H01M10/052, H01M10/056, H01M10/0583, H01M2/12, H01M10/0585 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
H01M10/0436 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/325 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/342 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0583 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0585 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/105 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/119 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/121 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/124 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/186 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02P70/50 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/31] | H01M10/02, H01M2/02, H01M2/08, H01M2/12, H01M10/04 | ||
Former IPC [2009/20] | H01M10/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/40] |
Former [2009/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT EINEM UNIDIREKTIONALEN AUSGANGSVENTIL | [2009/20] | English: | SECONDARY BATTERY INCLUDING ONE-WAY EXHAUST VALVE | [2009/20] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR COMPRENANT UNE SOUPAPE D'ÉCHAPPEMENT DE NON RETOUR | [2009/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 29.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4678725 (KIKUCHI YOICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,12,13 * figure 3 * * column 1, line 4 - column 2, line 28 * [A] 5-11; | [YDA]US5004655 (SYMANSKI JAMES S [US]) [YD] 1-4,12,13 * the whole document * [A] 5-11; | [YA]EP0862230 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-4,12,13 * page 2, line 8 - line 10 * * page 3, line 10 - line 14 * * page 3, line 23 - line 31 * * page 4, line 23 - line 39 * * page 6, line 12 - line 30 * * figures 1, 2, 9 * [A] 5-11; | [YDA]JP2001093489 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [YD] 1-4,12,13 * abstract * [A] 5-11; | [YDA]JP2003037028 (SHIZUKI ELECTRIC CO INC) [YD] 1-4,12,13 * abstract *[A] 5-11; | [YA]US2004038126 (GU CHANG-IL [KR]) [Y] 1-4,12,13 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1,2, 5 * [A] 5-11; | [YDA]JP2005116235 (NISSAN MOTOR) [YD] 1-4,12,13 * abstract * [A] 5-11; | [YA]WO2005122294 (NEC LAMILION ENERGY LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,12,13 * abstract * [A] 5-11 | International search | [A]JPH0745266 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD); | [A]JPH09237619 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2000149979 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD); | [A]KR20020042598 (IL KWANG CAN TECH CO LTD [KR]) |