Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8061762 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2011 | B2 | US2009322117 | 31.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0601858 | 11.09.2006 | WO2007SE00729 | 17.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010502511 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0601858 | 11.09.2006 | WO2007SE00729 | 17.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2066511 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2010 | A4 | EP2066511 | 10.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0601858 | 11.09.2006 | WO2007SE00729 | 17.08.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008033066 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0601858 | 11.09.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090055026 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0601858 | 11.09.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE530404 | 27.05.2008 | C2 | SE0601858L | 12.03.2008 | L | Priority number | Date | SE0601858 | 11.09.2006 |