EP2066511 - A VEHICLE DOOR AND A SIDE IMPACT BEAM FOR SUCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.05.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gestamp HardTech AB P.O. Box 828 971 25 Luleå / SE | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARVIDSSON, Stefan Källbogatan 9A S-941 63 Piteå / SE | 02 /
HEDLUND, Petrus Svanstigen 119 S-957 94 Övertorneå / SE | 03 /
BODIN, Hans Tunnlandsvägen 8 S-954 42 S:a Sunderbyn / SE | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB Drottninggatan 33, plan 4 111 51 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Aslund, G Roland Gestamp HardTech AB P.O. Box 828 97 125 Luleå / SE | Application number, filing date | 07794117.7 | 17.08.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007SE00729 | Priority number, date | SE20060001858 | 11.09.2006 Original published format: SE 0601858 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008033066 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2066511 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60J5/04, B60R21/01 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
B60J5/0444 (EP,KR,US);
B60J5/0412 (KR,SE);
B60R21/0428 (EP,KR,US);
B60R2011/0052 (KR);
B60R2021/0006 (KR);
B60Y2200/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGTÜR UND SEITENAUFPRALLSCHUTZ DAFÜR | [2009/24] | English: | A VEHICLE DOOR AND A SIDE IMPACT BEAM FOR SUCH | [2009/24] | French: | PORTIÈRE DE VÉHICULE ET BARRE PARE-CHOCS LATÉRALE POUR CELLE-CI | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 27.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/42] | 03.06.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4226869 (NIPPON SOKEN [JP], et al); | [X]US2004100388 (YOSHIDA MASAMI [JP], et al); | [E]WO2009131513 (GESTAMP HARDTECH AB [SE], et al) | International search | [A]EP0523704 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]GB2272670 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]); | [A]EP1671827 (BENTELER AUTOMOTIVE CORP [US]) |