Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9883929 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2018 | B2 | US2015005918 | 01.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007SE05066 | 22.08.2007 | US43869210 | 23.08.2010 | US201414488870 | 17.09.2014 | SE0601755 | 25.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010304332 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006SE01755 | 25.08.2006 | WO2007SE50566 | 22.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2053986 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2013 | B1 | EP2053986 | 06.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007SE50566 | 22.08.2007 | SE0601755 | 25.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2428566T | 08.11.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007SE50566 | 22.08.2007 | SE0601755 | 25.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008024063 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0601755 | 25.08.2006 |