EP2053986 - DENTAL SUPERSTRUCTURE, AND A METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES, IT | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kulzer GmbH Leipziger Strasse 2 63450 Hanau / DE | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/46] | For all designated states Heraeus Kulzer GmbH Grüner Weg 11 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states Heraeus Kulzer Nordic AB Box 22237 250 24 Helsingborg / SE | ||
Former [2013/27] | For all designated states Heraeus Dental AB Box 22237 250 24 Helsingborg / SE | ||
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Biomain AB Berga Allé 1 254 52 Helsingborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENZON, Sture c/o Blomain AB Box 22237 SE-250 24 Helsingborg / SE | [2013/27] |
Former [2009/44] | 01 /
BENZON, Sture c/o Blomain AB Box 22237 SE-250 24 Helsingborg / SE | ||
Former [2009/19] | 01 /
BENZON, Sture c/o Berga Allé 1 254 52 Helsingborg / SE | Representative(s) | Andersson, Björn E. Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [2013/27] |
Former [2009/19] | Andersson, Björn E. Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 07794176.3 | 22.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007SE50566 | Priority number, date | SE20060001755 | 25.08.2006 Original published format: SE 0601755 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008024063 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2053986 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2053986 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, A61C13/00 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
A61C8/0048 (EP,US);
A61C13/0022 (US);
A61C13/0004 (EP,US);
A61C13/0009 (EP,US);
A61C8/0051 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (US);
A61C8/0068 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Title | German: | DENTALE SUPERSTRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2009/19] | English: | DENTAL SUPERSTRUCTURE, AND A METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF | [2009/19] | French: | SUPERSTRUCTURE DENTAIRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 14.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.12.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.02.2011 | Observations by third parties | 30.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.04.2014
04.08.2017
WITHDRAWN Dentsply IH AB Aminogatan 1 431 21 Mölndal / SE Opponent's representative AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | 02
03.04.2014
18.06.2014
ADMISSIBLE Nobel Biocare Services AG Balz-Zimmermann-Str. 7 8302 Kloten / CH Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | 03
03.04.2014
03.11.2014
WITHDRAWN Straumann Holding AG Peter Merian-Weg 12 4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.04.2014
04.08.2017
WITHDRAWN Dentsply IH AB Aminogatan 1 431 21 Mölndal / SE Opponent's representative Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | ||
02
03.04.2014
18.06.2014
ADMISSIBLE Nobel Biocare Services AG Balz-Zimmermann-Str. 7 8302 Kloten / CH Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
03
03.04.2014
03.11.2014
WITHDRAWN Straumann Holding AG Peter Merian-Weg 12 4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.04.2014
08.04.2014
ADMISSIBLE Dentsply IH AB Aminogatan 1 431 21 Mölndal / SE Opponent's representative Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | ||
02
03.04.2014
18.06.2014
ADMISSIBLE Nobel Biocare Services AG Balz-Zimmermann-Str. 7 8302 Kloten / CH Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
03
03.04.2014
03.11.2014
WITHDRAWN Straumann Holding AG Peter Merian-Weg 12 4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.04.2014
08.04.2014
ADMISSIBLE Dentsply IH AB Aminogatan 1 431 21 Mölndal / SE Opponent's representative Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | ||
02
03.04.2014
18.06.2014
ADMISSIBLE Nobel Biocare Services AG Balz-Zimmermann-Str. 7 8302 Kloten / CH Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
03
03.04.2014
03.11.2014
WITHDRAWN Straumann Holding AG Peter Merian-Weg 12 4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2014/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.04.2014
08.04.2014
ADMISSIBLE Dentsply IH AB Aminogatan 1 431 21 Mölndal / SE Opponent's representative Somlo, Tommy Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | ||
02
03.04.2014
18.06.2014
ADMISSIBLE Nobel Biocare Services AG Balz-Zimmermann-Str. 7 8302 Kloten / CH Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
03
03.04.2014
03.11.2014
WITHDRAWN Straumann Holding AG Peter Merian-Weg 12 4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2014/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.04.2014
08.04.2014
ADMISSIBLE Dentsply IH AB Aminogatan 1 431 21 Mölndal / SE Opponent's representative Somlo, Tommy Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | ||
02
03.04.2014
ADMISSIBLE Nobel Biocare Services AG Balz-Zimmermann-Str. 7 8302 Kloten / CH Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
03
03.04.2014
WITHDRAWN Straumann Holding AG Peter Merian-Weg 12 4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | 26.06.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.01.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.01.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.11.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/17] | Appeal following opposition | 12.04.2017 | Appeal received No. T0979/17 | 11.07.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.11.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 20.01.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 17.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2007 | AT | 03.07.2013 | BE | 03.07.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | CY | 03.07.2013 | CZ | 03.07.2013 | DK | 03.07.2013 | EE | 03.07.2013 | FI | 03.07.2013 | LT | 03.07.2013 | LV | 03.07.2013 | MC | 03.07.2013 | MT | 03.07.2013 | NL | 03.07.2013 | PL | 03.07.2013 | RO | 03.07.2013 | SI | 03.07.2013 | SK | 03.07.2013 | TR | 03.07.2013 | IE | 22.08.2013 | LU | 22.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | GB | 03.10.2013 | GR | 04.10.2013 | IS | 03.11.2013 | PT | 04.11.2013 | IT | 22.08.2020 | ES | 23.08.2020 | FR | 31.08.2020 | DE | 02.03.2021 | [2022/23] |
Former [2021/35] | HU | 22.08.2007 | |
AT | 03.07.2013 | ||
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
TR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.08.2013 | ||
LU | 22.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GB | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
FR | 31.08.2020 | ||
DE | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 22.08.2007 | |
AT | 03.07.2013 | ||
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
TR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.08.2013 | ||
LU | 22.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GB | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
TR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GB | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GB | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 03.07.2013 | |
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 03.07.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0580945 (EBERLE MEDIZINTECH ELEMENTE [DE], et al); | [X]WO9847441 (LUOTIO KARI [FI]); | [Y]US6283753 (WILLOUGHBY ANDREW J M [BS]); | [A]US6382975 (POIRIER MICHEL [CA]) | Examination | - ANDERS ÖRTORP, On titanium framework and alternative impression techniques in implant dentistry, GÖTEBORG, ANDERS ÖRTORP, ISBN 91-628-6169-7 | - The Cresco FPD and implant concept: Presentation of a Technology for Fabrication of Abutment-Free, Passively Fitting Superstructures | other | US6361318 | - L.B. HELLDEN ET AL, "The cresco FPD and implant concept: Presentation of a technology for fabrication of abutment-free, Passively fitting superstructures", THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PERIODONTICS & RESTORATIVE DENTISTRY, (2005), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 3 - 9, XP003027231 | - ANDERS ÖRTORP, On Titanium frameworks and alternative impression techniques in implant dentistry, GÖTEBORG, THE SAHLGRENSKA ACADEMY GÖTEBORG UNIVERSITY, (2005), pages 1 - 79, ISSN 0348-6672, ISBN 91-628-6169-7, XP003027232 |