EP2054998 - A DRIVE SYSTEM FOR A TAP CHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states ABB Research LTD Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zurich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THORNELL-PERS, Christer Strandvägen 10 725 92 Västerås / SE | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Savela, Reino Aleksi, et al ABB AB Intellectual Property Forskargränd 7 721 78 Västerås / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Kock, Ina ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 07794189.6 | 24.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007SE50579 | Priority number, date | SE20060001756 | 25.08.2006 Original published format: SE 0601756 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008024068 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2054998 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02P13/06, H02P3/26, G05F1/147, G05F1/153, H01H9/00, H01F29/04, H02M1/10, H02M1/42 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
H02P13/06 (EP,KR,US);
H02P3/26 (KR);
G05F1/147 (EP,US);
G05F1/153 (EP,US);
H02M1/10 (EP,US);
H02M1/4225 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/19] | H02P13/06, H02P3/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Title | German: | ANSTEUERSYSTEM FÜR EINEN ABGRIFFSWECHSLER | [2009/19] | English: | A DRIVE SYSTEM FOR A TAP CHANGER | [2009/19] | French: | SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR UN CHANGEUR DE PRISE | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 22.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 11.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 22.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/26] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 21.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2410641 (TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AG) [X] 1 * page 2, line 1, paragraph 2; figure 1 * * page 4, line 2 * [Y] 2-19; | [XY]JPS58188109 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-19; | [Y]US5929591 (KATOU KOUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 2-19 * column 10, lines 7-15; figures 1,6 ** column 10, lines 51-60 *; | [XY]JPH11233354 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-19; | [Y]US2002044468 (GOODARZI ABAS [US], et al) [Y] 2-19 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] , [0053] , [0054]; figure 2 * | International search | [A]EP0695024 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [Y]US5886422 (MILLS ANDREW [CA]); | [A]WO0074198 (ABB AB [SE], et al); | [Y]JP2003015747 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]WO03044939 (DANFOSS DRIVES AS [DK], et al) |