EP2061490 - MODULATORS OF CANDIDA HYPHAL MORPHOGENESIS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agency for Science, Technology and Research 1 Fusionopolis Way No 20-10 Connexis Singapore 138632 / SG | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yue Institute of Molecular and Cell Biology Proteos, 61 Biopolis Drive Singapore 138673 / SG | 02 /
XU, Xiao-Li Institute of Molecular and Cell Biology Proteos, 61 Biopolis Drive Singapore 138673 / SG | 03 /
LEE, Teck Ho, Raymond Institute of Molecular and Cell Biology Proteos, 61 Biopolis Drive Singapore 138673 / SG | [2017/45] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
WANG, Yue Institute of Molecular and Cell Biology Proteos, 61 Biopolis Drive Singapore 138673 / SG | ||
02 /
XU, Xiao-Li Institute of Molecular and Cell Biology Proteos, 61 Biopolis Drive Singapore 138673 / SG | |||
03 /
LEE, Teck Ho, Raymond Institute of Molecular and Cell Biology Proteos, 61 Biopolis Drive Singapore 138673 / SG | Representative(s) | Jelsch, Emmanuel Edwin, et al Katzarov S.A. 12, Avenue des Morgines 1213 Petit-Lancy / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/45] | Jelsch, Emmanuel Edwin, et al Katzarov S.A. Rue des Epinettes 19 1227 Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2009/22] | Jelsch, Emmanuel Edwin, et al Katzarov S.A., Rue des Epinettes 19 1227 Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 07794275.3 | 21.08.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007SG00265 | Priority number, date | US20060823636P | 25.08.2006 Original published format: US 823636 P | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008024075 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2061490 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2061490 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 28.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K39/00, A61P31/10 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
C07K16/44 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (US);
A61K38/14 (US);
A61P31/10 (EP);
C07K16/14 (US);
C12Q1/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/45] |
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULATOREN DER CANDIDA HYPHAL MORPHOGENESE UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2009/22] | English: | MODULATORS OF CANDIDA HYPHAL MORPHOGENESIS AND USES THEREOF | [2009/22] | French: | MODULATION DE LA MORPHOGENÈSE HYPHALE DE CANDIDA ET UTILISATIONS DE CELLE-CI | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 08.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.08.2007 | AT | 08.11.2017 | CY | 08.11.2017 | CZ | 08.11.2017 | DK | 08.11.2017 | EE | 08.11.2017 | ES | 08.11.2017 | FI | 08.11.2017 | IT | 08.11.2017 | LT | 08.11.2017 | LV | 08.11.2017 | MC | 08.11.2017 | NL | 08.11.2017 | PL | 08.11.2017 | PT | 08.11.2017 | RO | 08.11.2017 | SE | 08.11.2017 | SI | 08.11.2017 | SK | 08.11.2017 | TR | 08.11.2017 | BG | 08.02.2018 | GR | 09.02.2018 | IS | 08.03.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 08.11.2017 | |
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0680974 (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 *cf. abstract, page 2, lines 3-15, claims 1-12*; | [A]WO2004091552 (SLESAREV VLADIMIR [US], et al) [A] 1-15*cf. abstract, page 1, lines 13-16, page 3, lines 12-22*; | [Y] - OGAWA T ET AL, "ENHANCEMENT OF SERUM ANTIBODY PRODUCTION IN MICE BY ORAL ADMINISTRATION OF LIPOPHILIC DERIVATIVES OF MURAMYLPEPTIDES AND BACTERIAL LIPOPOLYSACCHARIDES WITH BOVINE SERUM ALBUMIN", METHODS AND FINDINGS IN EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, PROUS, BARCELONA, ES, (19860101), vol. 8, no. 1, ISSN 0379-0355, pages 19 - 26, XP009142812 [Y] 1-15 *cf. summary* | [A] - SHIMI I R ET AL, "4,4'-isopropylidine-bis(2-isopropyl)phenol, a new inhibitor for cell wall formation of Bacillus subtilis", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19760401), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 580 - 584, XP009142808 [A] 1-15 *cf. abstract, and 1st para. of the left col. on page 580, furthermore the discussion part on page 583, last para. of the left col. bridging with col. on the right side* | International search | [X]US4396607 (LEFRANCIER PIERRE [FR], et al); | [X]US4522811 (EPPSTEIN DEBORAH A [US], et al) | by applicant | - J. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 276, pages 48988 - 48996 | - LIU, H., CURR. OPIN. MICROBIOL., (2001), vol. 4, pages 728 - 735 | - ROCHE, C.R. ET AL., MOL. BIOL. CELL, (2001), vol. 12, pages 3631 - 3643 | - CHAMAILLARD, M. ET AL., CELL MICROBIOL., (2003), vol. 5, pages 581 - 592 | - CHAMAILLARD, M., NAT. REV. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 4, pages 702 - 707 | - INOHARA, N.; NUNEZ, G., NAT. REV. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 3, pages 371 - 382 | - GIRARDIN, S.E.; PHILPOTT; D.J., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 34, pages 1777 - 1782 |