EP2013248 - PROCESS FOR POLYOLEFINE PRODUCTION USING FLUORINATED TRANSITION METAL CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fina Technology, Inc. P.O. Box 674412 Houston, TX 77267-4412 / US | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABBAS, Razavi Domaine De La Brisee 35 7000 Mons / BE | 02 /
MARIN, Vladimir 8803 Bexar Drive Houston, TX 77064 / US | 03 /
LOPEZ, Margarito 1615 Buckingham Drive Pasadena, TX 77504 / US | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Leyder, Francis, et al Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Leyder, Francis, et al Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Application number, filing date | 07794401.5 | 27.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007US10319 | Priority number, date | US20060413791 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: US 413791 | US20060493090 | 26.07.2006 Original published format: US 493090 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007127417 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2013248 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
B01J21/12 (EP,US);
C08F4/65 (KR);
B01J37/26 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F10/06 (EP,US);
C08F4/16 (KR);
C08F4/655 (KR);
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
C08F210/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/00 (EP,US);
C08F10/06, C08F4/025 (US,EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/20, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/12 (US,EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/14, C08F2500/20, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/12 (US,EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/20, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/12 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/20, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/12 (EP,US) (-) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYOLEFINEN MITHILFE FLUORINIERTER ÜBERGANGSMETALL-KATALYSATOREN | [2009/03] | English: | PROCESS FOR POLYOLEFINE PRODUCTION USING FLUORINATED TRANSITION METAL CATALYSTS | [2009/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POLYOLÉFINES UTILISANT DES CATALYSEURS À BASE DE MÉTAL DE TRANSITION FLUORÉS | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 09.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 07.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 01.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6144897 (SELLIERS JACQUES DE [BE]) [Y] 1-15 * claim - *; | [Y]WO0123433 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 13, line 23 - page 14, line 4; claim - *; | [A]US6368999 (SPECA ANTHONY N [US]) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [Y]WO0246246 (UNIVATON TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 34, line 18 - line 20; claim - *; | [Y]US6723804 (BATTISTE DAVID R [US]) [Y] 1-15* column 9, line 29 - line 36; claim - *; | [A]US2005165183 (MCCULLOUGH LAUGHLIN G [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2005075525 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [Y]US2005288462 (JENSEN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0124] * * claim - * * paragraphs [0129] , [ 151] , [ 316] *; | [Y] - ARDELL G G ET AL, "MODEL PREDICTION FOR REACTOR CONTROL", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING PROGRESS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19830601), vol. 79, no. 6, ISSN 0360-7275, pages 77 - 83, XP000600528 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2005054790 (MAWSON SIMON [US], et al); | [Y]US2006089470 (LOPEZ MARGARITO [US], et al); | [A]US2005266982 (HOLTCAMP MATTHEW W [US]) | Examination | WO0158587 |