EP2019593 - PRO-DRUGS OF TERTIARY ALCOHOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [2010/10] |
Former [2009/06] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGMANN, William, K. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
HAMMOND, Milton, L. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [2009/06] | Representative(s) | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2009/06] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07794759.6 | 11.05.2007 | [2009/06] | WO2007US11368 | Priority number, date | US20060800337P | 15.05.2006 Original published format: US 800337 P | [2009/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007136571 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2019593 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01N57/00, A61K31/66 | [2009/06] | CPC: |
C07D213/64 (EP,US);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRODRUGS AUS TERTIÄREN ALKOHOHLEN | [2009/06] | English: | PRO-DRUGS OF TERTIARY ALCOHOLS | [2009/06] | French: | PROMÉDICAMENTS D'ALCOOL TERTIAIRE | [2009/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/06] | 11.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006002133 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * line 10 - page 22, line 19; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]WO03077847 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2005239828 (HAGMANN WILLIAM K [US], et al) |