Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2026831
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
09.11.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
23.07.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.02.2012 |
First examination report |
|
30.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.05.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2009 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
02.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.01.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
23.01.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
23.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.12.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|