Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009156496 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US11576 | 14.05.2007 | US30059107 | 14.05.2007 | US80006806 | 12.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009536950 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US11576 | 14.05.2007 | US80006806 | 12.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007249738 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2008 | A2 | AU2007249738 | 22.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US11576 | 14.05.2007 | US80006806 | 12.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2026831 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US11576 | 14.05.2007 | US80006806 | 12.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2652015 | 22.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US11576 | 14.05.2007 | US80006806 | 12.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007133749 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2008 | A3 | WO2007133749 | 22.11.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US80006806 | 12.05.2006 |