EP2027443 - TEMPERATURE SENSOR ADAPTORS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WATLOW ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING COMPANY 12001 Lackland Road St. Louis Missouri 63146 / US | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOVACEVICH, Steven, A. W 3664 Jostad Road Mindoro, WI 54644 / US | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Knapp, Thomas Dreiss Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstrasse 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Knapp, Thomas Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/09] | Knapp, Thomas Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07795171.3 | 21.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007US12181 | Priority number, date | US20060437947 | 19.05.2006 Original published format: US 437947 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007136855 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2027443 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2027443 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01K7/02 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
G01D5/16 (EP,US);
G01K1/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | TEMPERATURSENSORADAPTER UND ENTSPRECHENDE VERFAHREN | [2009/09] | English: | TEMPERATURE SENSOR ADAPTORS AND METHODS | [2009/09] | French: | ADAPTATEURS DE CAPTEURS DE TEMPÉRATURE ET PROCÉDÉS CORRESPONDANTS | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 06.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2007 | AT | 01.02.2012 | BE | 01.02.2012 | CY | 01.02.2012 | CZ | 01.02.2012 | DK | 01.02.2012 | EE | 01.02.2012 | FI | 01.02.2012 | IT | 01.02.2012 | LT | 01.02.2012 | LV | 01.02.2012 | MT | 01.02.2012 | PL | 01.02.2012 | RO | 01.02.2012 | SI | 01.02.2012 | SK | 01.02.2012 | TR | 01.02.2012 | BG | 01.05.2012 | GR | 02.05.2012 | ES | 12.05.2012 | IE | 21.05.2012 | LU | 21.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | IS | 01.06.2012 | PT | 01.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
TR | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2012 | ||
LU | 21.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
TR | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 01.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2215150 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-41* the whole document *; | [X]US2001052814 (TAKITA MARK [US]) [X] 1,22,27,32 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0041]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2004006337 (NASAB MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-41 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0052]; figures 3,4 * |