EP2026713 - IMPROVEMENTS IN METHODS AND DEVICES TO CURB APPETITE AND/OR REDUCE FOOD INTAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endosphere, Inc. 4449 Easton Way, 2nd Floor Columbus OH 43219 / US | [2011/29] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Endosphere, Inc. 827 Mediterranean Ln Redwood City CA 94065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BINMOELLER, Kenneth P.O. Box PMB 148 Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US | 02 /
YUREK, Matt 12957 La Tortola San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 03 /
KECK, Zhenyong 617 Harbor Colony Drive Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 04 /
MCKINLEY, James 827 Mediterranean Lane Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2009/09] | Dee, Ian Mark Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07795330.5 | 25.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007US12462 | Priority number, date | US20060808820P | 26.05.2006 Original published format: US 808820 P | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007139920 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2026713 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/00, A61F2/04, A61M25/10 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
A61M25/1011 (EP);
A61F5/0079 (EP);
A61F2002/30062 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/09] | A61F2/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN VON VERFAHREN UND GERÄTEN ZUR APPETITZÜGELUNG UND/ODER REDUZIERUNG DER NAHRUNGSAUFNAHME | [2009/09] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN METHODS AND DEVICES TO CURB APPETITE AND/OR REDUCE FOOD INTAKE | [2009/09] | French: | PERFECTIONNEMENTS APPORTÉS À DES PROCÉDÉS ET DES DISPOSITIFS DESTINÉS À REFRÉNER L'APPÉTIT ET/OU RÉDUIRE L'INGESTION ALIMENTAIRE | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 27.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/26] | 01.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPAY]US2006178691 (BINMOELLER KENNETH F [US]) [XP] 1-10,12,13,15,16 * abstract * [A] 11 [Y] 14; | [XPI]WO2006092789 (TULIP BIOTECHNOLOGY LTD [IL], et al) [XP] 1-3,5-7,10 * abstract * * pages 3-4,9,11 * [I] 4,15,16; | [X]US5820584 (CRABB JERRY A [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11,15,16 * abstract * * column 5, lines 46-57 *; | [XY]US2005273060 (LEVY MICHALE J [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0042] - [0046] - [0160] , [0167] , [0206]; figures 2,8-9,16,26 * [Y] 14; | [X]US2003109931 (GEITZ KURT [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0006] * | International search | [X]US5820584 (CRABB JERRY A [US]); | [X]WO2006092789 (TULIP BIOTECHNOLOGY LTD [IL], et al); | [A]US2003040804 (STACK RICHARD S [US], et al); | [A]US2003109931 (GEITZ KURT [US]); | [A]US2006247718 (STARKEBAUM WARREN L [US]) |