EP2032039 - PARALLEL STEREOVISION GEOMETRY IN IMAGE-GUIDED RADIOSURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accuray Incorporated 1310 Chesapeake Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2009/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BODDULURI, Mohan 2746 Cowper Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Manley, Nicholas Michael WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [2017/43] |
Former [2009/11] | Manley, Nicholas Michael W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 07795535.9 | 30.05.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007US12824 | Priority number, date | US20060478047 | 28.06.2006 Original published format: US 478047 | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008002374 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2032039 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2032039 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/02, G21K4/00, G03C9/00, G06K9/00 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
G03C9/00 (EP,US);
A61B6/022 (EP,US);
A61B6/4007 (EP,US);
A61N5/1049 (EP,US);
G06T7/248 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1061 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1062 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10021 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10116 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/11] | A61B6/02, G21K4/00, G03C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/43] |
Former [2009/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PARALLELE STEREOVISIONSGEOMETRIE IN DER BILDGESTEUERTEN STRAHLENCHIRURGIE | [2009/11] | English: | PARALLEL STEREOVISION GEOMETRY IN IMAGE-GUIDED RADIOSURGERY | [2009/11] | French: | GEOMETRIE DE STEREOVISION PARALLELE EN RADIOCHIRURGIE GUIDEE PAR IMAGE | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 20.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 18.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2007 | AT | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | DK | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | ES | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | IT | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | NL | 25.10.2017 | PL | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | BG | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | IE | 30.05.2018 | LU | 30.05.2018 | MT | 30.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 30.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 30.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 30.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 25.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1240505 (POLIAK DANIEL; YOVANOVITCH DOUCHAN) [A] 1-30* col. 2, 6 lines up from bottom of column *; | [A]WO9413205 (ACCURAY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 7, line 11 *; | [IY]US2003016781 (HUANG WEN C [US]) [I] 1,3-9,11-18,20-26,28,29 * paragraphs [0027] , [0044]; figure 5 * [Y] 2,10,19,27,30; | [XY]US6862364 (BERESTOV ALEXANDER [US]) [X] 1,3-9,11-18,20-26,28,29 * (508), (506), (1603); column 16, lines 20-23; figure 5 * * column 15, lines 4-5 * [Y] 2,10,19,27,30; | [Y]WO2005024721 (ACCURAY INC [US], et al) [Y] 2,10,19,27,30 * (408) *; | [A]JP2005168601 (CANON KK) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0033] *; | [A]US2005180544 (SAUER FRANK [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0045] * | International search | [X]US5333107 (GRANGEAT PIERRE [FR], et al) |