EP2032270 - METHODS FOR PROTECTING GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning NY 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRADY, Michael, D. 9777Wedgewood Circle Woodbury MN 55125 / US | 02 /
SHAH, Himanshu C 4 Overbrook Road Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | 03 /
TAMMARO, David, A. 181 Hamilton Circle Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | [2009/19] |
Former [2009/11] | 01 /
BRADY, Michael, D. 158 Woodsedge Drive Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | ||
02 /
SHAH, Himanshu C 4 Overbrook Road Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | |||
03 /
TAMMARO, David, A. 181 Hamilton Circle Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | Representative(s) | Oldroyd, Richard Duncan, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2010/29] |
Former [2009/11] | Marchant, James Ian Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07795587.0 | 01.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007US12912 | Priority number, date | US20060447640 | 05.06.2006 Original published format: US 447640 | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007145846 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2032270 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B05D3/02, B05D5/12 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
B65G49/069 (EP,US);
C03C17/28 (KR);
B05D3/02 (KR);
B05D5/12 (KR);
C03C17/007 (EP,US);
C03C17/328 (EP,US);
B05D2203/35 (EP,US);
B05D2602/00 (EP,US);
B05D5/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/32] |
Former [2009/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHÜTZEN VON GLAS | [2009/11] | English: | METHODS FOR PROTECTING GLASS | [2009/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR PROTÉGER LE VERRE | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 31.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 06.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6896928 (ALLAIRE ROGER A [US], et al); | [Y]US2002176988 (MEDWICK PAUL A [US], et al); | [Y]US3644258 (MOORE CARL, et al); | [A]US5928848 (NAIR MRIDULA [US], et al); | [A]US2005003220 (KITAHARA SHIZUO [JP], et al); | [A]US2004054044 (BITTNER KLAUS [DE], et al) |