EP2047356 - PROVIDING INPUT AND OUTPUT FOR A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEEGAN, Hugh A. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
SAWHNEY, Ishdeep S. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
CHANG, Eric I. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2017/36] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
TEEGAN, Hugh A. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | ||
02 /
SAWHNEY, Ishdeep S. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
03 /
CHANG, Eric I. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2017/36] |
Former [2009/16] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07796450.0 | 25.06.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007US14789 | Priority number, date | US20060833733P | 27.07.2006 Original published format: US 833733 P | US20060633834 | 05.12.2006 Original published format: US 633834 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008013628 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047356 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2047356 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F15/02, H04B1/40, H04M1/725 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
G06F3/00 (KR);
H04M1/72409 (EP,US);
G06F13/14 (KR);
G06F15/00 (KR);
H04M1/724 (KR);
H04M1/72415 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/16] | G06F3/01, G06F15/02, H04B1/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEREITSTELLUNG DER EINGABE UND AUSGABE FÜR EINE MOBILE VORRICHTUNG | [2009/16] | English: | PROVIDING INPUT AND OUTPUT FOR A MOBILE DEVICE | [2009/16] | French: | MISE À DISPOSITION D'ENTRÉE ET DE SORTIE POUR UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 18.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.06.2007 | AT | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 25.06.2007 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB2369959 (UBINETICS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11,14,15 * abstract * * page 1, lines 1-13 * * page 4, line 13 - page 7, line 4 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 3,6,7,12[I] 8,9,13; | [XA]EP1617629 (VODAFONE KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,10,11,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0058] - [0061] * * figures 14,15 * [A] 3,5-9,12,13; | [X]WO2006068003 (IZUTSU MASAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | EP1871075 [ ] (IZUTSU MASAHIRO [JP]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0157] - [0159] - [0208] - [0214] * * figures 4-7 * | International search | [Y]US4545023 (MIZZI PIERRE M A [FR]); | [X]KR19990051306 ; | [Y]US6016248 (ANZAI MASATO [JP], et al); | [A]US2003223185 (DOCZY PAUL J [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2006068003 |