EP2043825 - COMPENSATING GRIPPER WITH INDEPENDENT GRIPPER ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goss International Americas, Inc. 121 Broadway Dover, NH 03820-3290 / US | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CURLEY, Richard, Daniel 262A Dover Point Road Dover, NH 03820 / US | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2009/15] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07796737.0 | 09.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007US15644 | Priority number, date | US20060483862 | 10.07.2006 Original published format: US 483862 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008008299 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2043825 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2043825 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/12, B65H5/14 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
B65H5/12 (EP,US);
B65H5/14 (EP,US);
B65H2301/44714 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4474 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4479 (EP,US);
B65H2403/51 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2301/44714, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/02 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4474, B65H2220/01 (US,EP);
B65H2301/4479, B65H2220/02 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/15] | B25J15/08 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2009/48] |
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUSGLEICHSGREIFER MIT UNABHÄNGIGER GREIFEREINSTELLUNG | [2009/15] | English: | COMPENSATING GRIPPER WITH INDEPENDENT GRIPPER ADJUSTMENT | [2009/15] | French: | PINCE DE COMPENSATION A RÉGLAGE DE PINCE INDÉPENDANT | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 21.05.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2012/32] |
Former [2009/50] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | CH DE FR GB | ||
Date: | 12.10.2009 | ||
[2012/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003217656 (CAUNTER NICHOLAS [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9 * the whole document * [I] 4-6,10 | International search | [X]US2348741 (JESSEN LE ROY S); | [X]US6079541 (BERCELLI GIANLUCA [IT], et al); | [X]US5201501 (FASSLER GEORGES [FR]); | [X]US5871242 (WHITNEY DENZIL [US]); | [Y]US2005225023 (SCHLOUGH JAMES R [US]); | [A]US6616139 (AESCH BEAT VON [CH]) |