EP2020140 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING REGISTRATION TRAFFIC FOR A SERVER IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corporation 32 Avenue of the Americas New York NY 10013-2412 / US | [2009/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARADISE, Michael 1408 Whitefence Road Bartlett, Illinois 60103 / US | [2009/06] | Representative(s) | Asquith, Julian Peter Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/06] | Asquith, Julian Peter Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07797300.6 | 30.04.2007 | [2009/06] | WO2007US67824 | Priority number, date | US20060414798 | 01.05.2006 Original published format: US 414798 | [2009/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007130922 | Date: | 15.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2020140 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2020140 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/56 | [2009/06] | CPC: |
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L47/15 (EP,US);
H04L47/70 (EP,US);
H04L47/745 (EP,US);
H04L47/746 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/19] |
Former [2009/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DES REGISTRIERUNGSVERKEHRS FÜR EINEN SERVER IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2009/06] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING REGISTRATION TRAFFIC FOR A SERVER IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2009/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR CONTRÔLER LE TRAFIC D'ENREGISTREMENT POUR UN SERVEUR DANS UN RÉSEAU DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION | [2009/06] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/06] | 02.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1324544 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 36 - page 7, paragraph 49 * * page 9, paragraph 59 - page 11, paragraph 67 * * page 14, paragraph 80 - paragraph 85 * * page 16, paragraph 98 - page 17, paragraph 99 *; | [A]US2004255156 (CHAN TAT KEUNG [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 29 ** page 4, paragraph 33 - page 5, paragraph 36 * |