Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015322136 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514812695 | 29.07.2015 | US86637006 | 17.11.2006 | US79881206 | 09.05.2006 | US88699407 | 29.01.2007 | US90583310 | 15.10.2010 | US74564407 | 08.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011028348 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86637006 | 17.11.2006 | US79881206 | 09.05.2006 | US88699407 | 29.01.2007 | US90583310 | 15.10.2010 | US74564407 | 08.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007292936 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86637006 | 17.11.2006 | US79881206 | 09.05.2006 | US88699407 | 29.01.2007 | US74564407 | 08.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009536527 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US68469 | 08.05.2007 | US86637006 | 17.11.2006 | US79881206 | 09.05.2006 | US88699407 | 29.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007249408 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US68469 | 08.05.2007 | US86637006 | 17.11.2006 | US79881206 | 09.05.2006 | US88699407 | 29.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2016101 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US68469 | 08.05.2007 | US86637006 | 17.11.2006 | US79881206 | 09.05.2006 | US88699407 | 29.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2651567 | 22.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US68469 | 08.05.2007 | US86637006 | 17.11.2006 | US79881206 | 09.05.2006 | US88699407 | 29.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007134050 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2008 | A3 | WO2007134050 | 10.07.2008 | A8 | WO2007134050 | 22.11.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US86637006 | 17.11.2006 | US79881206 | 09.05.2006 | US88699407 | 29.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR060871 | 16.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86637006 | 17.11.2006 | US79881206 | 09.05.2006 | US88699407 | 29.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200812616 | 16.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US86637006 | 17.11.2006 | US79881206 | 09.05.2006 | US88699407 | 29.01.2007 |