EP2027496 - DIFFUSER FILMS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Sabic Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAN, Chi, Kwong Flat 1310 Lee Foo House Shun Lee Estate, Kowloon / HK | 02 /
BAI, Yaowen Room 422 Apartment 2 Building 62 Youth Apartment, Chang Chun Yuan Peking University Beijing 100871 / CN | 03 /
XU, Jinghui Room 1707 8 Nanhai Road Shekou, Shenzhen 518067 / CN | 04 /
BASTAWROS, Adel 6520 Venice Drive Newburgh, IN 47630 / US | 05 /
KUMAR, Karkala, Arun 4705 Shady Court Evansville, IN 47712 / US | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 07798110.8 | 05.06.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007US70392 | Priority number, date | US20060422390 | 06.06.2006 Original published format: US 422390 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007146663 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2027496 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/02, G02F1/1335 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
G02B6/0051 (EP,US);
G02B5/02 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02B6/0046 (EP,US);
G02B6/0053 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24355 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STREUFILME UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2009/09] | English: | DIFFUSER FILMS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THE SAME | [2009/09] | French: | FILMS DIFFUSEURS ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1447686 (TAKIRON CO [JP]) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2006114569 (CAPALDO KEVIN P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-14,16-21 * claims 1,8,10 * * figure 5 *; | [Y]US2002015123 (IWATA YUKIMITSU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-21 * paragraph [0060] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0976529 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 1-21 * paragraph [0045] *; | [Y]WO2005093469 (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * page 40, paragraph 4 - page 41, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2,8 * |