EP2023804 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SNORE DETECTION AND CONFIRMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adidas AG Adi-Dassler-Strasse 1 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2011/51] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states Adidas AG Adi-Dassler-Strasse 1 91072 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Vivometrics, Inc. 121 North Fir Street Suite E Ventura, CA 93001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DERCHAK, P., Alexander 9 Beekman Terrace Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | 02 /
MYERS, Lance 998 Church Street 34 Ventura, California 93001 / US | 03 /
LUCIA, Gary, Michael 121 N. Fir Street, Suite E Ventura, California 93001 / US | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Wegner, Hans, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/25] | Wegner, Hans, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Charlton, Peter John, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2009/08] | Holme Patent A/S Vesterbrogade 20 1620 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 07798146.2 | 06.06.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007US70466 | Priority number, date | US20060811777P | 08.06.2006 Original published format: US 811777 P | US20070758581 | 05.06.2007 Original published format: US 758581 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007146687 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2023804 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2023804 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/02 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
A61B5/1135 (EP,US);
A61B5/6805 (EP,US);
A61B5/4806 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHNARCHERKENNUNG UND -BESTÄTIGUNG | [2009/08] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SNORE DETECTION AND CONFIRMATION | [2009/08] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION ET DE CONFIRMATION DE RONFLEMENT | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 02.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2007 | AT | 23.05.2012 | BE | 23.05.2012 | CY | 23.05.2012 | CZ | 23.05.2012 | DK | 23.05.2012 | EE | 23.05.2012 | FI | 23.05.2012 | IT | 23.05.2012 | LT | 23.05.2012 | LV | 23.05.2012 | MT | 23.05.2012 | NL | 23.05.2012 | PL | 23.05.2012 | RO | 23.05.2012 | SE | 23.05.2012 | SI | 23.05.2012 | SK | 23.05.2012 | TR | 23.05.2012 | IE | 06.06.2012 | LU | 06.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | BG | 23.08.2012 | GR | 24.08.2012 | ES | 03.09.2012 | IS | 23.09.2012 | PT | 24.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
MT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
TR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IE | 06.06.2012 | ||
LU | 06.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
MT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
TR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
MT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
IE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
IE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
IE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 23.05.2012 | |
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 23.05.2012 | |
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 23.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5989193 (SULLIVAN COLIN EDWARD [AU]) [A] 1-14* column 5, lines 3-15 * | International search | [A]US6273859 (REMMERS JOHN E [CA], et al); | [A]US2005211247 (NODA SATOSHI [JP], et al) |