EP2032105 - SUPERTHIN WOUND DRESSING HAVING FOLDED RELEASE SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jentec Inc. 20 Charles Street Northvale NJ 07647 / US | [2009/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEWEY, James, C. 32 Terri Lee Lane New Hempstead, NY 10977 / US | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07798861.6 | 21.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007US71736 | Priority number, date | US20060816295P | 23.06.2006 Original published format: US 816295 P | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007149958 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2032105 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/02 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
A61F13/023 (EP,US);
A61F13/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEHR DÜNNE WUNDAUFLAGE MIT GEFALTETEM FREISETZUNGSBLATT | [2009/11] | English: | SUPERTHIN WOUND DRESSING HAVING FOLDED RELEASE SHEET | [2009/11] | French: | PANSEMENT DE PLAIES EXTRA FIN À FEUILLE DE LIBÉRATION REPLIÉE | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 12.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/11] | 29.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2205243 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON) [A] 1-27 * page 1, line 23 - page 5, line 3; figures 3-5; examples 3,4 *; | [A]EP1020198 (JENTEC INC [US]) [A] 1-27 * paragraph [0023]; figures 1,2; claims 1-23 *; | [A]WO2006001853 (JENTEC INC [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * figures 1,2; claims 1-31 *; | [PA]WO2007057612 (URGO LAB [FR], et al) [PA] 1-27 * page 1, line 15 - line 27; figure 1; claims 1-16 *; | [A]EP0360458 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB]) [A] 18-27 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5618556 (JOHNS OWEN L [US], et al) [A] 18-27 * figures 1-7 *; | [PA]US2007016123 (JENSEN JARL [US]) [PA] 18-27 * the whole document * |