EP2032131 - METHOD OF TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline LLC One Franklin Plaza 200 North 16th Street Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline LLC One Franklin Plaza 200 North 16th Street Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US | ||
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham Corporation One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSCH-PETERSEN, Jakob 709 Swedeland Road King Of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 02 /
BRAY, Jeffrey, D. 709 Swedeland Road King Of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 03 /
LAPING, Nicholas, J. 709 Swedeland Road King Of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 04 /
GRYGIELKO, Eugene, T. 709 Swedeland Road King Of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 05 /
GOODMAN, Richard, M. 709 Swedeland Road King Of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Povey, Alexander W.G., et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Povey, Alexander W.G., et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07798924.2 | 22.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007US71864 | Priority number, date | US20060805626P | 23.06.2006 Original published format: US 805626 P | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007150015 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2032131 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/495, A61P15/00, A61K31/18 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/18 (EP,US);
C07D241/04 (KR);
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (KR);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P11/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/11] | A61K31/17, A61K31/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 19.12.2008 | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2009/11] | English: | METHOD OF TREATMENT | [2009/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 26.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/44] | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004039775 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 1, line 3 - page 3, line 2; example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2005079769 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-11* claim - *; | [X] - ULUKUS. M. ET AL, "Expression of interleukin-8 in endometriosis", HUMAN REPRODUCTION, (200503), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 794 - 801, XP002537310 [X] 1-11 * paragraph [DISCUSSION]; example - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/HUMREP/DEH675 | International search | [Y]WO0035442 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al); | [Y]US2005038080 (BOYER STEPHEN [DE], et al) |