EP2175479 - A METHOD FOR PROCESSING A SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE SURFACE AND A CHEMICAL PROCESSING DEVICE FOR THE SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wuxi Suntech Power Co., Ltd. 17-6 Chang Jiang South Road, New District, Wuxi Jiangsu 214-028 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states Wuxi Suntech Power Co. Ltd. 17-6 Chang Jiang South Road, New District, Wuxi Jiangsu 214-028 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JI, Jingjia 17-6 Changjiang South Road New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | 02 /
SHI, Zhengrong 17-6 Changjiang South Road New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | 03 /
QIN, Yusen 17-6 Changjiang South Road New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07800773.9 | 23.08.2007 | [2010/15] | WO2007CN02553 | Priority number, date | CN20071135836 | 16.07.2007 Original published format: CN200710135836 | [2010/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009009931 | Date: | 22.01.2009 | Language: | ZH | [2009/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2175479 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/304, H01L21/306, H01L21/67 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
H01L21/30604 (EP,US);
H01L21/302 (KR);
H01L21/306 (KR);
H01L21/67057 (EP,US);
H01L21/67086 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/15] | H01L21/304, H01L21/306 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINER HALBLEITERSUBSTRATOBERFLÄCHE UND CHEMISCHE VERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR DIE HALBLEITERSUBSTRATOBERFLÄCHE | [2010/15] | English: | A METHOD FOR PROCESSING A SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE SURFACE AND A CHEMICAL PROCESSING DEVICE FOR THE SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE SURFACE | [2010/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE SURFACE DE SUBSTRAT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT CHIMIQUE POUR LA SURFACE DE SUBSTRAT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2010/15] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2010 | Translation filed | 09.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 13.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2006196781 (SHARP KK) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0067] *; | [A]DE102005062528 (SCHMID GMBH & CO GEB [DE]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2001015476 (MITSUBISHI MATERIAL SILICON); | [A]JP2001319908 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2002158208 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2002270998 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]CN1573434 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]JP2006073753 (RENESAS TECH CORP); | [A]JP2006070349 (RENESAS TECH CORP); | [A]KR20060060995 (SEMES CO LTD [KR]) |