EP2056573 - INTEGRATED CUT-IN SYSTEM AND METHOD AND INTEGRATED CUT-IN MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong Province 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Haijun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong Province 518129 / CN | 02 /
SHENG, Hui Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong Province 518129 / CN | [2011/45] |
Former [2009/19] | 01 /
WU, Haijun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong Province 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
SHENG, Hui Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong Province 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/19] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07800775.4 | 23.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007CN02555 | Priority number, date | CN20061111811 | 23.08.2006 Original published format: CN200610111811 | [2009/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008025256 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2056573 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2056573 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/10 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
H04L12/66 (EP,US);
H04L12/2867 (EP,US);
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
H04Q11/04 (EP,US);
H04L65/1023 (EP,US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04M11/062 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13039 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13106 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1319 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13196 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13209 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13213 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13292 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13299 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13335 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13348 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13389 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES EINSCHALTSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN SOWIE INTEGRIERTES EINSCHALTMODUL | [2009/19] | English: | INTEGRATED CUT-IN SYSTEM AND METHOD AND INTEGRATED CUT-IN MODULE | [2009/19] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSERTION INTÉGRÉS ET MODULE D'INSERTION INTÉGRÉ | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2009 | Translation filed | 23.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 27.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2007 | BE | 09.11.2011 | CY | 09.11.2011 | CZ | 09.11.2011 | DK | 09.11.2011 | EE | 09.11.2011 | FI | 09.11.2011 | LT | 09.11.2011 | LV | 09.11.2011 | MT | 09.11.2011 | NL | 09.11.2011 | PL | 09.11.2011 | RO | 09.11.2011 | SI | 09.11.2011 | SK | 09.11.2011 | TR | 09.11.2011 | BG | 09.02.2012 | GR | 10.02.2012 | IS | 09.03.2012 | PT | 09.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
TR | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 09.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002191760 (WATTWOOD JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1-18* paragraphs [0004] , [0005] *; | [X]US6600741 (CHRIN CHRISTOPHER JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 21, lines 29-46; figure 17 * * column 21, lines 62-65 * * column 22, lines 1-4 * | International search | [A]CN1284806 (NANFANG COMM HUIZHOU INDUSTRY [CN]); | [Y]CN1315789 (NUOER INDUSTRY GROUP CO LTD SI [CN]); | [A]WO0173987 (ADC TELEDATA COMM LTD [IL]); | [A]EP1146696 (TENOVIS GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [Y]US2002154630 (LUCIONI GONZALO [DE]); | [A]US6480487 (WEGLEITNER MARK A [US], et al); | [A]CN1533658 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]CN1784079 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [XP]CN1909558 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) | by applicant | US2002154630 | US2002191760 | US6600741 |