EP2070861 - POWER SUPPLYING EQUIPMENT FROM ELECTRIC SUPPLY NETWORK FOR RUBBER-TIRED CRANE IN PORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai E-Port Electric Co., Ltd. No. 11 Non 2933 Huqingping Rd. Shanghai / CN | [2010/27] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states He, Qinfen B17 No. 900 Yi Shan Road Shanghai 200233 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAO, Qifan B17, No. 900, Yi Shan Road Shanghai 200233 / CN | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Barbaro, Gaetano, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via G. Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [2013/02] |
Former [2010/27] | Adorno, Silvano, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/25] | Adorno, Silvano Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07800891.9 | 10.09.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007CN02675 | Priority number, date | CN2006245914U | 18.09.2006 Original published format: CN 200620045914 U | [2009/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008043244 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070861 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2070861 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B66C13/12, H02G7/00, H01R41/00, B66C19/00 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
B66C13/12 (EP,US);
B66C19/007 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/25] | B66C13/12, H02G7/00, H01R41/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSEINRICHTUNG VON EINEM ELEKTRISCHEN VERSORGUNGSNETZ FÜR EINEN GUMMIREIFENKRAN IN EINEM HAFEN | [2009/25] | English: | POWER SUPPLYING EQUIPMENT FROM ELECTRIC SUPPLY NETWORK FOR RUBBER-TIRED CRANE IN PORT | [2009/25] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT D'ALIMENTATION DU RÉSEAU ÉLECTRIQUE POUR GRUE À PORTIQUE SUR PNEUMATIQUES EN CAOUTCHOUC DANS UN PORT | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2009 | Translation filed | 17.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 28.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2007 | AT | 15.01.2014 | BE | 15.01.2014 | BG | 15.01.2014 | CY | 15.01.2014 | CZ | 15.01.2014 | DK | 15.01.2014 | EE | 15.01.2014 | FI | 15.01.2014 | IT | 15.01.2014 | LT | 15.01.2014 | LV | 15.01.2014 | MC | 15.01.2014 | MT | 15.01.2014 | PL | 15.01.2014 | RO | 15.01.2014 | SE | 15.01.2014 | SI | 15.01.2014 | SK | 15.01.2014 | TR | 15.01.2014 | GR | 16.04.2014 | IS | 15.05.2014 | PT | 15.05.2014 | IE | 10.09.2014 | LU | 10.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | FR | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 10.09.2007 | |
AT | 15.01.2014 | ||
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 15.01.2014 | |
IS | 15.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003137494 (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2005239377 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]US4587383 (STOLDT ERWIN F [US]); | [A]CN1807219 (SHANGHAI ZHENHUA PORT MACH CO [CN]); | [A]CN1504399 (SHANGHAI ZHENHUA PORT MACH CO [CN]); | [A]US4667834 (LANIGAN WILLIAM P [US], et al) |